Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:23-cv-00851
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Case in other court:USCA- 11th Circuit, 23-13433-JJ USCA- 11th Circuit, 23-13433-JJ
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 9:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Jeffrey R. Bohling
Represented By
Nicholas Francesco McDaniel
Taylor English Duma
contact info
Todd Edward Jones
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Alison M. Ballard
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bohling Protective Services, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Francesco McDaniel
Taylor English Duma
contact info
Todd Edward Jones
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Alison M. Ballard
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Universal Protection Service, LLC
Represented By
Matthew D. Crawford
Martenson Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
Matthew Dempsey Treco
Martenson Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
Andrew L Edge
Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kelvin Smith
Terminated: 04/27/2023
Represented By
Gabrielle Moses
Stanton Law LLC
contact info
Todd Hamilton Stanton
Stanton Law, LLC
contact info
A.J. Elijah Davis
Elijah Davis
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
110 110 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Wed 04/24 4:16 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Universal Protection Service, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. Pursuant to FRAP 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a),82 Notice of Appeal,74 Notice of Appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-13433 JJ. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
109 109 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/23 9:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Treco, Matthew)
Related: [-]