Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:23-bk-10324
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 19, 2023

Debtor
AnthymTV Co.
10 Cottage Street
Wellesley, MA 02482
Represented By
Andrea M. O'Connor
Fitzgerald Law, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only) Wed 04/19 8:16 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (sl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
23 23 court Inter-District BK Transfer Out Thu 04/06 7:54 AM
Receipt of Transferred Case from District of South Carolina. (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
22 22 34 pgs order Order Transferring Case Tue 04/04 10:18 AM
Order dated 4/4/2023 Transferring Venue Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual Filed by AnthymTV Co. AS SET FORTH IN THE ATTACHED ORDER DATED MARCH 31, 2023, THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FORTHE DISTRICT OF SOUTH CAROLINA HAS DETERMINED PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE 1014(B) THAT THIS CASESHOULD PROCEED IN SOUTH CAROLINA. IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORDER, VENUE OF THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TOTHE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
21 21 trustee Notice of Trustee's Resignation Mon 04/03 11:34 AM
Notice of Trustee's Resignation Involvement of Trustee (With Certificate of Service) Stephen S. Gray Terminated (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 02, 2023
court Meeting of Creditors Not Held Sun 04/02 10:47 AM
341 Meeting Not Held By order dated March 31, 2023, (Hon. Elisabetta G. M. Gasparini), the case has been consolidated under C/A 23-00438 EG and venue transferred to the District of South Carolina (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
20 20 26 pgs misc Schedules (Original) Thu 03/30 4:32 PM
Schedules A-H. , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 03/17 12:50 PM
Endorsed Order dated 3/17/2023 Re:17 Motion filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. to Extend Time to File Documents. ALLOWED. THE DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 30, 2023. (jreg)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Fri 03/17 12:04 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Andrea M. O'Connor in the amount of $37,500.00. Plus $0.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extend Time Fri 03/17 12:01 PM
Motion filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)] with certificate of service. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 03/11 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 03/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
15 15 crt_gen Court's Notice of 341 Sent 11 Corporation Wed 03/08 1:52 PM
Court's Notice of 341 sent. (sl)
Related: [-]
trustee Statement of Dial-In Information Wed 03/08 1:59 PM
Telephonic Meeting Information for Section 341 Meeting of Creditors: Dial-in Number: 877-369-9123 Participant Code: 8635039#. For International Call Information Please Contact the Trustee. (202) 306-3815) (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Wed 03/08 1:51 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/3/2023 at 02:30 PM as Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 5/12/2023. (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
14 14 8 pgs motion Employ Tue 03/07 4:13 PM
Application filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. to Employ Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd P.A. as Special Counsel filed with Affidavit along with certificate of service and proposed order. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Mon 03/06 1:34 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Stephen S. Gray added to the case. (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Statement of Stephen S. Gray, Subchapter V Trustee
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Update Mon 03/06 12:43 PM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Atty Disclosure Statement , Schedules A-H , Statement of Financial Affairs ,Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/20/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 3/20/2023. (nr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
11 11 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 03/03 5:09 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
10 10 9 pgs motion Employ Fri 03/03 5:09 PM
Application filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. to Employ Fitzgerald Law, P.C. as Counsel filed with Affidavit along with certificate of service and proposed order. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Non Existence (Sec. 1116) Fri 03/03 5:03 PM
Statement of Non Existence (Sec. 1116)re: Cash Flow Statement filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Operations Fri 03/03 5:03 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Balance Sheet Fri 03/03 5:02 PM
Balance Sheet filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Tax Documents Fri 03/03 5:01 PM
Federal Tax Documents for the Year(s) of 2021 filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Supplemental Document Fri 03/03 5:01 PM
Supplemental Document: Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
4 4 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 03/03 4:58 PM
Equity Security Holders filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Fri 03/03 4:57 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing of Nicholas Cartier Related [+] filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2 2 misc Certificate of Vote Fri 03/03 4:55 PM
Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor AnthymTV Co. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/03 4:54 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by AnthymTV Co.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 06/1/2023. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 03/03 5:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-10324 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A19961897, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1