Seattle School District No 1 v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00987 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Washington Western, 2:23-cv-00032 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
1600 AMPHITHEATRE PARKWAY
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
|
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Technologies LLC
|
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Instagram LLC
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Snap Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tiktok Inc.
|
|
Defendant
XXVI Holdings Inc
|
|
Defendant
YouTube LLC
|
|
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Seattle School District No. 1
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/11 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Seattle School District No. 1 (Kawamoto, Dean) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Wed 12/20 10:22 AM
MDL 3047 MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the plaintiff's24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of 12/11/2023, civil case no. 4:23-cv-00987-YGR Seattle School District No. 1 v. Meta Platforms, Inc., et al is terminated. cc: JPMDL. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 10/04 12:27 PM
STIPULATION STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLING OF CLAIMS REGARDING ALPHABET, INC. AND XXVI HOLDINGS, INC. filed by Seattle School District No. 1. (Kawamoto, Dean) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 03/03 3:22 PM
Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:23-cv-00032. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 03/06 2:46 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL-3047: Washington Western, 2:23-cv-00032, Seattle School District No 1 v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 4:23-cv-987-YGR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order; CTO-3 cc: JPMDL (jlm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21 MDL 3047 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3); in re Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Products Liability Litigation; transferred to the Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (LH) | |
Att: 1 Email re transfer | ||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
20 | 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on TikTok Inc. on 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
19 | 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Snap Inc. on 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
18 | 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Meta Platforms, Inc. on 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
17 | 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Meta Payments Inc. on 1/11/2023 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) Modified on 1/23/2023 correct date at request of filer (CDA). | |
16 | 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Google LLC on 1/11/2023 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) Modified on 1/23/2023 correct date at request of filer (CDA). | |
15 | 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Facebook Technologies, LLC on 1/11/2023 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) Modified on 1/23/2023 correct date at request of filer (CDA). | |
14 | 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ByteDance Inc. on 1/11/2023 1/12/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) Modified on 1/23/2023 correct date at request of filer (CDA). | |
13 | 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on YouTube, LLC on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
12 | 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on XXVI Holdings Inc. on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
11 | 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Siculus, Inc. on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
10 | 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Instagram, LLC on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
9 | 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Facebook Operations, LLC on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
8 | 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Facebook Holdings, LLC on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
7 | 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Alphabet Inc. on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Northern District of California, case number(s) in other court MDL No. 3047 ; filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Garrett Heilman. Filed by Plaintiff Seattle School District No 1. (Heilman, Garrett) | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) | |
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER: The Honorable John H. Chun recuses himself and the case is reassigned in rotation to the Honorable Richard A. Jones. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 2:23-cv-00032-RAJ. Authorized by Judge John H. Chun. (SB) | |
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alphabet Inc, ByteDance Inc, Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Technologies LLC, Google LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Payments Inc, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc, Snap Inc, TikTok Inc, XXVI Holdings Inc, YouTube LLC (MJV) | |
Judge John H. Chun added. (MJV) | ||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Dean N Kawamoto added to party Seattle School District No 1(pty:pla), filed by Seattle School District No 1.(Kawamoto, Dean) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/9/2023 due to malformed PDF) (CDA). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Alphabet Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons ByteDance Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Facebook Holdings, LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Facebook Operations, LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Facebook Technologies, LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Google LLC, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Instagram, LLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Meta Payments Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Meta Platforms, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons Siculus, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Summons Snap Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons TikTok Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Summons XXVI Holdings Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Summons YouTube, LLC |