Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Referred: Mark E Ford
Case #: 6:23-cv-06025
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2023
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Zachary Sheets

GPO Sep 19 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Zachary Sheets. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 19, 2023. (tmc)
GPO Nov 08 2023
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 13 Report and Recommendations in toto; Plaintiffs Complaint 1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 8, 2023. (tmc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Wed 11/08 9:42 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for13 Report and Recommendations in toto; Plaintiffs Complaint1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 8, 2023. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 09/19 12:40 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Zachary Sheets. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 19, 2023. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
12 12 order Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY Tue 08/22 3:02 PM
TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by August 15, 2023. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2023.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 22, 2023. (klk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
11 11 order Order Regarding Complaint Deficiency - TEXT ONLY Tue 07/25 2:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order . The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved Complaint for NonPrisoner . In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode , 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 8/15/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 25, 2023. (klk) Modified docket text on 7/25/2023 (tmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Tue 07/18 10:41 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change within 30 days of any such change. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 18, 2023. (klk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Mon 07/17 10:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Zachary Sheets. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
8 8 order Order Regarding IFP Application-Deficient or Renew - TEXT ONLY Fri 06/30 9:08 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff filed a Notice of Change of Address indicating that he has now been released from custody. When a Plaintiff is released from confinement, the policy of the Court is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to send a blank IFP Application to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee or complete and sign the IFP Application within 21 days. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee or resubmit an IFP application by the deadline . CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 7/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 30, 2023. (klk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Thu 06/29 11:36 AM
Docket Annotation: Updated Plaintiff's address based on phone call; Copy of Text Only Order 6 and docket sheet sent to Plaintiff at new updated address. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/30 1:45 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender No Longer here. Mail originally sent to Zachary Sheets at GARLAND COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 3564 Albert Pike Road HWY 270 W Hot Springs, AR 71913-9542 including 6 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY,. No new address available. New Address due by 6/29/2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
6 6 order Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY Tue 05/16 11:28 AM
TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint by May 8, 2023. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 16, 2023. (klk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
5 5 order Order Regarding Complaint Deficiency - TEXT ONLY Mon 04/17 2:31 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order . The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form . In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode , 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 5/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 17, 2023. (klk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Mon 03/06 4:16 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Mon 03/06 4:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Zachary Sheets. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/06 4:13 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer case to the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on March 3, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Mon 03/06 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Does, filed by Zachary Sheets.(jlm)
Related: [-]