Colorado District Court
Judge:Robert E Blackburn
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:23-cv-00585
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2023 3:53 AM MDT
Defendant
Bonneville Billing & Collections, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph J. Lico
Robinson & Henry PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sunderland
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Hyslip
Hyslip Legal, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, August 11, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 08/11 11:14 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice10 is approved; all claims are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs; and this case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/11/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Fri 08/11 8:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Plaintiff Karen Sunderland. (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
9 9 order Minute Order Tue 06/20 8:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER re:8 Notice of Settlement filed by Karen Sunderland. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 8/18/2023. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/20/2023. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
Monday, June 19, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 06/19 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Karen Sunderland (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/03 3:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Joseph J. Lico added to party Bonneville Billing & Collections, Inc.(pty:dft) by Bonneville Billing & Collections, Inc..(Lico, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 03/15 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Sunderland. Bonneville Billing & Collections, Inc. served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/07 1:15 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7 March 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/22/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/07 11:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/2023. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
3 3 misc Summons Issued Tue 03/07 8:53 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Monday, March 06, 2023
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 03/07 8:51 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/06 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Bonneville Billing & Collections, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8974263)Attorney Jeffrey Scott Hyslip added to party Karen Sunderland(pty:pla), filed by Karen Sunderland.(Hyslip, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet