Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Case #: 4:23-cv-04030
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2023
Case in other court:Howard County Circuit Court, 31CV-23-00005
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 4:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Howard Memorial Hospital
Represented By
William A. Waddell, Jr.
Friday, Eldredge & Clark
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Insurance Carrier
Plaintiff
Pamela Garza
Represented By
Randall K. Pulliam
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info
Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Carney Bates & Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonita Martin
Represented By
Randall K. Pulliam
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info
Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Carney Bates & Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bill Roberts
Represented By
Randall K. Pulliam
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info
Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Carney Bates & Pulliam PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2023
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 8, 2023.(mll)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 11/08 9:58 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 8, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 11/03 2:13 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Bonita Martin. (Pulliam, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 07/11 9:48 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification. Any motion for class certification must be filed on or before Tuesday, September 5, 2023. All other remaining pretrial filing deadlines set forth in the Court's Final Scheduling Order remain. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 11, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
notice Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Fri 07/07 10:18 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Pamela Garza, Bonita Martin, Bill Roberts. Motion for Extension of Time to File9 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Gary F. Lynch .(mll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
9 9 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 07/05 1:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by Pamela Garza, Bonita Martin, Bill Roberts. (Pulliam, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
8 8 order Final Scheduling Order Thu 04/20 2:07 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 4/15/2024 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 20, 2023. (rwg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
7 7 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/07 1:31 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Howard Memorial Hospital. (Waddell, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
6 6 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 03/08 8:19 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 4/5/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/12/2023. Jury Trial set for the week of 4/15/2024 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on 3/8/2023. (rwg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/07 2:21 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by Howard Memorial Hospital.(Waddell, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Tue 03/07 2:01 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
3 3 27 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/07 1:55 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Howard Memorial Hospital, John Doe Insurance Carrier filed by Bonita Martin, Bill Roberts, Pamela Garza.(mll)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/07 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Howard County Circuit Court, case number 31CV-23-5 filed by Howard Memorial Hospital.(mll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/07 1:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Howard Memorial Hospital.(mll)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Tue 03/07 2:04 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Pamela Garza, Bonita Martin, Bill Roberts. Complaint3 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Gary F. Lynch .(mll)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee Tue 03/07 2:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/9/2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Submitted Tue 03/07 2:16 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2740573.. (Waddell, William)
Related: [-]