Watercraft LTD
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth D Katz |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-40171 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 05, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | May 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Debtor
Watercraft LTD
406 Boston Road
Billerica, MA 01821 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608 |
|
Trustee
Janice G Marsh
Janice G. Marsh, LLC 210 Park Avenue No. 356
Worcester, MA 01609 |
Docket last updated: 03/08/2023 12:12 AM EST |
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/07 9:45 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-40171 ) [misc,volp7] ( 112.00). Receipt Number A19964097, amount $ 112.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 03/07 9:04 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $112 Filed by Business Watercraft LTD. (Saber, Donna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Schedules (Original)
Tue 03/07 9:11 AM
Schedules A-G. filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
Tue 03/07 9:12 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Tue 03/07 9:13 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Tue 03/07 9:14 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Donna Lea Saber in the amount of $2500. Plus $0.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
Tue 03/07 9:18 AM
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD. (Saber, Donna) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix
Tue 03/07 9:43 AM
Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Debtor Business Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order to Update
Tue 03/07 1:43 PM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Matrix Due 3/8/2023. Corporate Vote due by 3/14/2023.Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule 1007(a)(1) , Declaration Re: Electronic Filing ,Attorney/Debtor Signature Page due 3/21/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 3/21/2023. (nr) |
|
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b(Assets) (Use For Auto Assign Only)
Tue 03/07 4:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 4/5/2023 at 10:30 AM as a Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 5/16/2023. (ajta) |
|
10 | 10
court
Matrix
Tue 03/07 7:47 PM
Matrix filed by Debtor Watercraft LTD (Saber, Donna) |