Turley v. Kijakazi
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cheryl A Eifert |
Referred: | Cheryl A Eifert |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00191 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Attorney Fees
Tue 12/26 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the15 Motion by Steven T. Turley for Attorney Fees; directing the Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/26/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (ts) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply To Response
Thu 12/21 1:14 PM
REPLY by Steven T. Turley to15 MOTION by Steven T. Turley for Attorney Fees,17 Response In Opposition. (Parker, Robert) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response In Opposition
Thu 12/07 4:44 PM
RESPONSE by Kilolo Kijakazi in opposition to15 MOTION by Steven T. Turley for Attorney Fees (Bailey, Jason) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 11/02 10:31 AM
ORDER re:15 MOTION by Steven T. Turley for Attorney Fees, directing the Defendant's objections shall be filed on or before 12/7/2023; and Plaintiff's reply to any objections shall be filed within fourteen (14) days following filing of Defendant's objections. In the event that Defendant should fail to file timely objections, the Court will decide this matter based on Plaintiff's Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/2/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (mfo) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 10/25 1:41 PM
MOTION by Steven T. Turley for Attorney Fees(Parker, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Fee Agreement/Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment - Social Security Case
Thu 07/27 4:32 PM
JUDGMENT ORDER In accordance with the13 Memorandum Opinion; this case dismissed with prejudice and removed from the docket of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/27/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (lca) |
|
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Remand To Commissioner of Social Security
Thu 07/27 4:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION reversing the final decision of the Commissioner; granting11 MOTION to Remand To Commissioner of Social Security; remands this matter and dismisses this action from the docket of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/27/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (lca) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent To Proceed Before U. S. Magistrate Judge - CASE ALREADY ASSIGNED
Thu 07/27 10:40 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF U. S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kilolo Kijakazi , Steven T. Turley. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (ts) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Remand To Commissioner of Social Security
Thu 07/27 8:54 AM
MOTION by Kilolo Kijakazi to Remand Case to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Bailey, Jason) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief In Supp Of Judgment On The Pleadings In A Soc Sec Case - USE ONLY IF NO MOTION IS BEING FILED
Fri 06/30 9:35 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Steven T. Turley (Parker, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Extend Time to File Document
Thu 06/01 9:33 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's8 AMENDED MOTION for Extension; Plaintiff has until 7/5/2023 to file Brief in Support of Judgment on the Pleadings; Defendant has until 8/4/2023 to file her Brief in Support of Defendant's Decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/1/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (lca) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time To File Document
Fri 05/26 1:44 PM
AMENDED MOTION by Steven T. Turley to Extend Time to File Amended Social Security Brief to 7/05/2023 Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Parker, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time To File Document
Fri 05/26 1:05 PM
MOTION by Steven T. Turley to Extend Time to File Social Security Brief to 7/05/2023 Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Parker, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 05/04 9:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Bailey, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Fri 03/10 11:55 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE granting1 APPLICATION by Steven T. Turley to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that any recovery obtained is to be paid to the Clerk, who will then pay all unpaid costs and fees and pay the balance to Plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/10/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (kew) |
|
4 | 4
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Fri 03/10 9:08 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Wed 03/08 10:47 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Steven T. Turley. (msa) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/08 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Wed 03/08 10:40 AM
APPLICATION by Steven T. Turley to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (msa) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 03/09 9:27 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) |