Schoolfield v. Mena Hospital Commission
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02031 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Polk County Circuit Court, 57CV-23-00024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 4:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mena Hospital Commission
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Schoolfield
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/09 11:09 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks for all further proceedings. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 9, 2024. (mjm) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 05/22 4:56 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint in the lead case, 23-2002 so the motion to dismiss is moot. "[A]n amended complaint supercedes an original complaint and renders the original complaint without legal effect." Schlafly v. Eagle F. , 970 F.3d 924, 933 (8th Cir. 2020). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 22, 2023. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Breean Walas on behalf of A. S., P. S., Daniel Smedley, Jessica Smedley. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02002-PKH, 2:23-cv-02021-PKH, 2:23-cv-02023-PKH, 2:23-cv-02027-PKH, 2:23-cv-02031-PKH(Walas, Breean) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER: Cases 23-2002 23-2021 23-2023 23-2027 and 23-2031 consolidated. The LEAD case shall be 23-2002 All future pleadings shall be filed in the LEAD case (See order for specifics). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 20, 2023. (mjm) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/07 12:26 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting9 Unopposed MOTION To Hold Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Abeyance Pending Ruling on Motion to Consolidate. The briefing on Defendant's motion to dismiss5 is held in abeyance until the Court resolves the motion to consolidate in the related case 2:23-cv-2002. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 7, 2023. (mc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Unopposed MOTION To Hold Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Abeyance Pending Ruling on Motion to Consolidate re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carl Schoolfield. (Gates, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/22 2:14 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff will be granted a 14-day extension. Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss5 due on or before April 14, 2023. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 22, 2023. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carl Schoolfield. (Gates, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2023. Jury Trial set for 1/29/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Michelle McEntire Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 17, 2023. (mjm) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mena Hospital Commission.(Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc) |
|
3 | 3
![]() STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Mena Hospital Commission, filed by Carl Schoolfield.(tmc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Circuit Court, case number 57CV-23-24, filed by Mena Hospital Commission.(tmc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mena Hospital Commission. (tmc) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Wed 03/08 12:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/10/2023 (tmc) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Wed 03/08 1:02 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2741337.. (Lowe, Timothy) |