Charon-Ferrer v. Smith et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04031 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Hempstead County Circuit Court, 29CV-23-00015-1 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Derrick Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bladimir Charon-Ferrer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/17 12:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ricardo Reyna is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 17, 2025. (ljl) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() MOTION for Attorney Ricardo Reyna to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-3133067) by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/8/2025 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for Specifics . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 7, 2025. (mmr) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER granting32 Motion to Continue. The case is moved from the previous trial setting of 03/17/2025.; ***jury trial terminated. See Order for Specifics . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 15, 2025. (mmr) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER granting28 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must supplement his responses to Interrogatories on or before December 23, 2024 See Order for Specifics . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 13, 2024. (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of28 MOTION to Compel by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Derrick Smith. (Mikles, Kara) |
|
28 | 28
![]() MOTION to Compel by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Derrick Smith.(Mikles, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/17/2025 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 2, 2024. (rwg) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER granting25 Motion to Continue. The case is moved from the previous trial setting of 4/15/2024. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2024. (rwg) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Mikles, Kara) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Mikles, Kara) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer re22 Pretrial Disclosure Sheet (Hernandez, Jerry) |
|
22 | 22
![]() PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hernandez, Jerry) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry V Hernandez on behalf of Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hernandez, Jerry) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/11 3:49 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Carlos Garcia is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 11, 2023. (ljl) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Attorney Carlos Garcia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2809335) by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/14 11:04 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amanda Muth is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 14, 2023. (ljl) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION for Attorney Amanda Muth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2802745) by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER granting15 Motion to Extend Time to Serve. Plaintiff has up to and including August 7, 2023, to serve Defendant Derrick Smith. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 15, 2023. (bjb) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION to Extend TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT DERRICK SMITH by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 4/15/2024 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 20, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jerry Hernandez is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2023. (ljl) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jason Linnstaedter is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2023. (ljl) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Attorney Jerry Hernadez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2743924) by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of8 MOTION for Attorney Jason Linnstaedter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2743879) Declaration by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Attorney Jason Linnstaedter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2743879) by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer. (Hartness, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 4/6/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/13/2023. Jury Trial set for the week of 4/15/2024 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 9, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ODFL for Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.(mll) |
|
4 | 4
![]() STATE COURT ANSWER to3 Complaint by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Derrick Smith.(mll) |
|
3 | 3
![]() STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Derrick Smith filed by Bladimir Charon-Ferrer.(mll) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hempstead County Circuit Court, case number 29CV-23-15-1 filed by Derrick Smith, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.(mll) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Derrick Smith.(mll) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Wed 03/08 1:32 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal,1 Civil Cover Sheet : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2741379.. (Mikles, Kara) |