Shade v. Bureau of Prisons et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00192 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Objection To Proposed Findings And Recommendations
Tue 03/19 11:54 PM
OBJECTION to16 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge,, by John William Shade, III (Shade, John) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and Recommendations
Mon 02/19 9:41 PM
MOTION by John William Shade, III for Extension of Time to File Objection to 04/20/2024 re:16 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge,,. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Shade, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Proposed Findings and Recommendations By Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/06 9:06 AM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Court DENY the1 APPLICATION by John William Shade, III to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; DISMISS Plaintiff's2 ,11 Complaints; and REMOVE this matter from the docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 2/20/2024. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 2/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/6/2024. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous
Thu 12/28 12:04 PM
ORDER OF 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 23-2294 Order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (kew) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice From 4CCA - General
Tue 12/19 3:22 PM
DOCKETING NOTICE - ORIGINAL PROCEEDINGS as to John William Shade, III in 4CCA Case No. 23-2294 dated 12/19/2023. (arb) |
|
13 | 13
appeal
Notice From 4CCA - General
Tue 12/19 3:16 PM
COPY of Petition for Writ of Procedendo by John William Shade, III, received by 4CCA on 12/18/2023, and opened in 4CCA as Case No. 23-2294 (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (arb) |
|
12 | 12
appeal
Notice Of Docket Activity From 4CCA (Generic)
Tue 12/19 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ACTIVITY in 4CCA Case No. 23-2294 dated 12/19/2023, re: Notice of Original Proceeding by John William Shade, III; Case Manager: Rachel Phillips. (arb) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Mon 06/12 10:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by John William Shade, III against United States of America, Jason Bailey, Brittany Boyer, Michael Carvajal, C. Day, Fred Malone, Christopher Maruka, James Petrucci, M. Rife, Eric Rokosky, Fred Saunders, James Wills, and John Does 1-10. (arb) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/05 3:34 PM
ORDER granting the9 MOTION by John William Shade, III for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall his Amended Complaint by 6/12/2023. Due to this generous extension of time (60 days), Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that no further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 4/5/2023. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time To Amend
Tue 04/04 10:07 PM
MOTION by John William Shade, III to Extend Time to Amend Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Shade, John) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/10 9:58 AM
ORDER granting the4 MOTION by John William Shade, III to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights. It is ORDERED that any login and password issued to Plaintiff is temporary, for use in this case only, and will be terminated upon the resolution of this case. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must satisfy the training requirements per the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the U. S. District Court for the Southern District of WV. Plaintiff is directed to contact Lynn Cooper, Executive Assistant, in the Charleston U. S. District Court Clerk's Office, for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/10/2023. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Appointment of Counsel
Fri 03/10 9:45 AM
ORDER denying the3 MOTION by John William Shade, III for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/10/2023. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb) |
|
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/10 9:34 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that he should amend his2 Complaint to specifically identify whether he is asserting a claim under the FTCA, Bivens, or both. To the extent Plaintiff is asserting a FTCA claim, Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that he should amend his Complaint to name the United States as the Defendant. To the extent Plaintiff is asserting a Bivens claim, Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that he should amend his Complaint to name individual defendants and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Plaintiff has until 4/11/2023 to amend his Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/10/2023. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se w/form Complaint) (arb) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Wed 03/08 4:53 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/08 4:49 PM
PRO SE MOTION by John William Shade, III to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights (arb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appointment Of Counsel
Wed 03/08 4:45 PM
MOTION by John William Shade, III for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel (arb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/08 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Wed 03/08 4:40 PM
APPLICATION by John William Shade, III to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 03/09 9:01 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |