Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:P K Holmes III
Case #: 5:23-cv-05037
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2023
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 4:47 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
National American Insurance Company
Represented By
Steven K Metcalf
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
William Spitler
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
The Continental Insurance Company
Represented By
Pamela Dunlop Gates
Cna
contact info
Cross Claimant
National American Insurance Company
Represented By
Steven K Metcalf
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
William Spitler
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew Byron
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Brian F Walthart
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Christina Culver
Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.
contact info
David Michael Taylor
Thompson Coe
contact info
Brian S. Martin
Thompson Coe Cousins Irons
contact info
Cross Defendant
John Doe Insurance Company(ies) 1-20
Cross Defendant
HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By
Laura J Grabouski, I
Holden Litigation
contact info
Cross Defendant
Commerce & Industry Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard Shane Strabala
Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Colony Insurance Company
Represented By
David M. Donovan
Watts, Donovan, Tilley & Carson
contact info
Defendant
Western World Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard Shane Strabala
Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew Byron
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Brian F Walthart
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Christina Culver
Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.
contact info
David Michael Taylor
Thompson Coe
contact info
Brian S. Martin
Thompson Coe Cousins Irons
contact info
Defendant
National American Insurance Company
Represented By
Steven K Metcalf
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
William Spitler
Metcalf & Spitler, LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Insurance Company(ies) 1-20
Defendant
HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By
Steven E. Holden
Holden Litigation
contact info
Laura J Grabouski, I
Holden Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Commerce & Industry Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard Shane Strabala
Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Colony Insurance Company
Represented By
David M. Donovan
Watts, Donovan, Tilley & Carson
contact info
Taylor Williams
Watts, Donovan, Tilley & Carson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
The Continental Insurance Company
Represented By
Pamela Dunlop Gates
Cna
contact info

GPO Nov 01 2023
mjm)OPINION AND ORDER granting 72 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff Continental Insurance Company's claims against Defendant HDI are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 1, 2023. (

Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Friday, May 17, 2024
130 130 misc Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party Fri 05/17 9:47 AM
CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL: re129 Stipulation filed by The Continental Insurance Company. the claims against each other between Continental and Colony Insurance Company hereby are dismissed with prejudice. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
129 129 misc Stipulation Thu 05/16 4:25 PM
STIPULATION re122 Notice of Settlement Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as Between The Continental Insurance Company and Colony Insurance Company by The Continental Insurance Company. (Dunlop Gates, Pamela)
Related: [-]