Keppers v. Martin et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Referred: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01017 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 08/10 1:32 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on August 10, 2023.(mll) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/24 3:23 PM
NOTICE by Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger re 13 Order Directing Response to Motion - TEXT ONLY, (Mosley, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 06/20 2:54 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender. Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Micah Jude Keppers at Columbia County Jail including14 Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases. No new address available. New Address due by 7/20/2023.(mll) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 06/12 1:48 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Micah Keppers at Magnolia, AR including 13 Order Directing Response to Motion - TEXT ONLY. No new address available. New Address due by 7/12/2023. (tg) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/08 11:11 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 8, 2023.(sss) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Ptf consent, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Defendants Consent | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases
Wed 06/07 1:21 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 11/6/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on June 7, 2023. (sss) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Directing Response to Motion - TEXT ONLY
Thu 06/01 9:32 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO MOTION11 TO DISMISS. On May 31, 2023, Defendants filed a Motion to Dismiss, along with a brief in support. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 6/22/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on June 1, 2023. (awl) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 05/31 3:56 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) by Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger. (Mosley, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/31 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) by Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger.Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(Mosley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Returned Mail | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/30 12:31 PM
NOTICE by Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger No Intent to File Dispositive Motion Based on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies (Mosley, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Bench Order PC cases - TEXT ONLY
Fri 04/14 10:46 AM
TEXT ONLY BENCH ORDER. If Defendant(s) intend to pursue a defense, pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 42 U.S.C. 1997(e)(a), that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his/her administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, Defendant(s) must raise the issue in a motion for summary judgment filed no later than 45 days from the date of this Order. All discovery is stayed until the Court resolves any exhaustion issues. If Defendant(s) do(es) not intend to pursue an exhaustion defense, the Defendant(s) should PROMPTLY file a notice so stating. Summary Judgment Motion due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 14, 2023. (awl) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Thu 04/13 3:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger.(Mosley, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 4:05 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger and USM285 Forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, 6 Order Directing Service.(mll) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Service
Wed 03/15 1:56 PM
ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 15, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(mll) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Thu 03/09 2:20 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished (tg) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Thu 03/09 2:13 PM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Columbia County to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $15.83; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Columbia County). (tg) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial
Thu 03/09 2:03 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 9, 2023. (tg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Thu 03/09 2:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Micah Keppers. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(tg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Thu 03/09 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Leroy Martin, Gean Sieger, filed by Micah Keppers.(tg) |