Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Referred: Barry A Bryant
Case #: 1:23-cv-01019
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 22, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Thursday, June 01, 2023
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/01 2:35 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS unable to forward. Mail originally sent to George Davidson at Ashley County Jail including5 Order of Dismissal. No new address available. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 05/22 3:03 PM
ORDER - CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 22, 2023. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
4 4 order Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY Fri 03/31 9:24 AM
TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to file a completed IFP Application by March 30, 2023. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 31, 2023. (awl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Thu 03/09 2:17 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Provisionally Filing Complaint Thu 03/09 2:15 PM
ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 3/30/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 9, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Thu 03/09 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Johnny Oliver, filed by George Junior Davidson.(jlm)
Related: [-]