Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Referred: Christy D Comstock
Case #: 4:23-cv-04033
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:May 30, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
9 9 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 06/07 9:15 AM
OBJECTION to7 Report and Recommendations by Willie Munn.(mll)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Order on Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/30 8:36 AM
ORDER adopting7 Report and Recommendations. Case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 30, 2023. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 05/08 8:50 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re5 Amended Complaint filed by Willie Munn. Objections to R&R due by 5/25/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 8, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
6 6 misc Response Thu 04/06 4:56 PM
RESPONSE by Willie Munn re3 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint, Order Directing Pleading to be Filed.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/31 8:54 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mike Mike, Deputy Bush, Duncan Culpepper, James Stayton, James Singleton, Ben Hale, James Wise, Charles Friday, Katado filed by Willie Munn.(mll)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
utility Memo of Reassignment Mon 03/20 9:47 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(src)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Fri 03/10 11:24 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Provisionally Filing Complaint Order Directing Pleading to be Filed Fri 03/10 11:21 AM
ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically, the Court requires the following information: why Plaintiff does not believe the three strikes rule applies to this case. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order; ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint and 3 strikes response due by 3/30/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 10, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Fri 03/10 11:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Willie Munn. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Fri 03/10 11:10 AM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Deputy Bush, Duncan Culpepper, Charles Friday, Ben Hale, Katado, Mike Mike, James Singleton, James Stayton, James Wise filed by Willie Munn.(mll)
Related: [-]