California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 5:23-cv-01097
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Daniel Beck
Represented By
Darren Laverne
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Kristopher Benjamin Kastens
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Barry H. Berke
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Daniel Michael Ketani
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Jennifer S. Windom
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Greg W. Becker
Represented By
Alexander K. Talarides
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
James Neil Kramer
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
SVB Financial Group
Represented By
Diane McGimsey
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Kim Stevenson
Represented By
Adam E. Polk
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Howard Tarlow
Represented By
Adam E. Polk
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Movant
Tamir Einy
Represented By
Adam Marc Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Movant
KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By
Christopher Francis Moriarty
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP
contact info
Lance V. Oliver
Motley Rice, LLC
contact info
Movant
Norges Bank
Represented By
Jonathan D. Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Naumon A Amjed
Kessler Topaz Meltzer Check, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info
Salvatore J Graziano
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
Movant
Sjunde AP-Fonden
Represented By
Jonathan D. Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
contact info
Naumon A Amjed
Kessler Topaz Meltzer Check, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info
Salvatore J Graziano
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
Movant
Mahendra Sreerama
Represented By
Laurence Matthew Rosen
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Chandra Vanipenta
Represented By
Laurence Matthew Rosen
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 17, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/17 6:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greg W. Becker.. (Talarides, Alexander)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/17 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides on Behalf of Defendant Greg W. Becker (Talarides, Alexander)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/17 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer on Behalf of Defendant Greg W. Becker (Kramer, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 03/14 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Daniel Beck, Greg W. Becker, SVB Financial Group. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/14 9:23 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/13 2:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Chandra Vanipenta re1 Complaint, (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Mon 03/13 1:05 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 03/13 11:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/13 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Chandra Vanipenta ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18066217.). Filed by Chandra Vanipenta.(Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 3/14/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification and Schedule A