Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Mark E Ford
Case #: 2:23-cv-02034
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 21, 2023
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
Interested Party
Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Plaintiff
Jonathan A Wilcox

GPO Jun 21 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 21, 2023. (jlm) Modified on 7/20/2023 (src).
GPO Jun 21 2023
ORDER REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER PURSUANT TO SENTENCE SIX of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the 10 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 21, 2023. (jlm)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 10/10 12:14 PM
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying17 Motion to Amend/Correct. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 10, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/06 3:01 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Judgment on Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
16 16 order Judgment - Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 10/02 10:45 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Plaintiff is awarded the sum of $1,152.00 for attorneys fees pursuant to the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412 The parties are reminded that to prevent double recovery by counsel for the Plaintiff, the award herein under the EAJA will be taken into account at such time as a reasonable fee is determined pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 2, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
15 15 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/26 11:40 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re13 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
14 14 msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Tue 09/19 11:15 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of13 MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA by Jonathan A Wilcox.(Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Itemization of Services,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Calculation of Fees,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Counsel
13 13 motion Attorney Fees Tue 09/19 11:10 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jonathan A Wilcox. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion for Relief Thu 07/20 1:40 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY (src)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Judgment - SSA Wed 06/21 2:11 PM
ORDER REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER PURSUANT TO SENTENCE SIX of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the10 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 21, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 06/21 2:08 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 21, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
9 9 motion Remand Wed 06/14 1:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/10 4:23 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Social Security Commissioner's Answer is now due 7/11/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 10, 2023. (cla)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/10 12:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/14 10:46 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 14, 2023. (cla)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/14 10:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan A Wilcox. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA Tue 03/14 10:27 AM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jonathan A Wilcox. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice - SSA Tue 03/14 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/28/2023.(bjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee Tue 03/14 10:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/16/2023 (cla)
Related: [-]
service Affidavit of Service as to USA Tue 03/14 11:27 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 03/13 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Jonathan A Wilcox.(Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/13 1:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jonathan A Wilcox. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc)
Related: [-]