Gotspace Equity Fund 1, LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10367 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Dismissed: | Jun 29, 2023 |
Debtor
Gotspace Equity Fund 1, LLC
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Petitioning Creditor
Fiorillo Family Realty Trust, by Nicholas Fiorillo, Trustee
3 Kales Way
Harwichport, MA 02646 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Gotspace Management, LLC
268 Newbury St. 4th Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
|
Petitioning Creditor
Gotspace Beverly, LLC
268 Newbury St. 4th Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
|
Petitioning Creditor
Gotspace Gloucester, LLC
268 Newbury St. 4th Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion For Sanctions/Costs
Wed 03/27 2:51 PM
Order dated 3/27/2024 Re:78 Motion filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC for Sanctions or Costs. See Order for Full Text. (dc) |
|
court
Hearing Scheduled/Continued/Rescheduled (No Forms Attached)
Wed 03/27 3:05 PM
In-Person Hearing Scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 03:30 PM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA. Objections due by 4/3/2024 at 04:30 PM on75 Submission of Material Filed by S&J Bros Storage, LLC in Support of4 Motion for Fees, Damages, Punitive Damages and Sanctions. (hm) |
||
court
Hearing Scheduled/Continued/Rescheduled (No Forms Attached)
Wed 03/27 3:08 PM
In-Person Hearing Scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 03:30 PM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA. Objections due by 4/3/2024 at 04:30 PM on76 Affidavit of Stephen Quillinan In Support of75 Submission of Material Filed by S&J Bros Storage, LLC in Support of4 Motion for Fees, Damages, Punitive Damages and Sanctions. (hm) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
motion
Sanctions/Costs
Tue 03/26 10:30 AM
Motion filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC for Sanctions or Costs with certificate of service. (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
77 | 77
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 03/26 10:21 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing by Stephen Quillinan in Support of Affidavit filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
76 | 76
misc
Affidavit
Tue 03/26 10:19 AM
Affidavit of Stephen Quillinan In Support of Submission of Material in Support of Motion for Costs, Fees, Damages, Sanctions and Punitive Damages with certificate of service filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
75 | 75
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 03/26 10:16 AM
Supplemental Document: Submission of Material in Support of Motion for Fees, Damages, Punitive Damages and Sanctions with certificate of service filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 03/24 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 03/23 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
72 | 72
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/22 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Order Scheduling Hearing on Damages filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
71 | 71
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/21 4:41 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing Re:70 Order. (sl) |
|
70 | 70
5
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 03/21 4:09 PM
Order dated 3/21/2024 Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on the Award of 11 U.S.C. Section 303(i) Damages Against the Petitioners in Dismissed Cases Re:4 Motion filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC to Dismiss Case,6 Affidavit of Stephen Quillinan filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC. (sl) |
|
69 | 69
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/21 3:41 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing Re:66 Order dated 3/20/2024 to Show Cause Directed to Nicholas Fiorillo. (sl) |
|
68 | 68
misc
Exhibit
Thu 03/21 9:27 AM
Exhibit filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B (Bradford, Eric) |
|
67 | 67
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/21 9:00 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B (Bradford, Eric) |
|
court
Hearing Scheduled (multi hearing - no form)
Thu 03/21 4:15 PM
Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/4/2024 at 03:30 PM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:4 Re: 4 Motion filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC to Dismiss Case,6 Affidavit of Stephen Quillinan filed by Other Party S&J Bros Storage, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2024 at 04:30 PM. (sl) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
7
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 03/20 5:58 PM
Order dated 3/20/2024 to Show Cause Directed to Nicholas Fiorillo. See Order for Full Text. (sl) |
|
court
Hearing Scheduled/Continued/Rescheduled (No Forms Attached)
Wed 03/20 6:01 PM
Show Cause Hearing to be held on 4/4/2024 at 03:30 PM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:66 Order dated 3/20/2024 to Show Cause Directed to Nicholas Fiorillo. Responses due by 4/3/2024 at 04:30 PM. (sl) |