Haller v. Marshall et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal - Rule 41
Mon 08/14 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, Without Prejudice, by Robert Lee Haller pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (arb) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/24 2:34 PM
Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number 1000164. (mk) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response To Court Order
Fri 04/14 3:44 PM
RESPONSE by Robert Lee Haller to the Court's12 Order (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (mk) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Mon 03/27 10:51 AM
ORDER denying1 ,9 APPLICATIONS by Robert Lee Haller to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; directing Plaintiff to pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $402.00 to the Clerk on or before 4/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/27/2023. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (mk) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Fri 03/24 6:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Robert Lee Haller against William K. Marshall and Curtis Dixon (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation - Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Authorization To Release Institutional Account Information
Mon 03/20 3:53 PM
AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND TO PAY FILING FEE by Robert Lee Haller (Attachment: #1 Resident Average Balance Statement) (mk) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Mon 03/20 3:51 PM
APPLICATION by Robert Lee Haller to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter & Envelope). Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/15 1:01 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his4 Complaint to specifically set forth his constitutional claims and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that this Court does not have jurisdiction concerning his claims of alleged misconduct occurring at the Northern Correctional Facility and Jail ("NCF&J") or over employees of the NCF&J. Plaintiff should restrict his claims to alleged violations occurring within the Southern District of WV. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that he is required to exhaust available administrative remedies prior to filing a civil action, and that if he wishes to fully exhaust his administrative remedies prior to seeking relief, he should voluntarily dismiss this action and initiate a new action upon completion of the administrative remedy process. Plaintiff has until 4/17/2023 to amend his Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/15/2023. (cc: Plaintiff w/form Complaint) (arb) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/15 12:30 PM
ORDER construing Plaintiff's5 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief as a5 Motion for Extension of Time to File his Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs and granting same; directing that Plaintiff's1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs be returned to Plaintiff for completion, including all information contained in the Certificate portion; further directing Plaintiff to return the Application to the Court on or before 4/17/2023. In the alternative, Plaintiff may pay the Court's $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/15/2023. (cc: Plaintiff w/IFP Application) (arb) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 03/14 2:53 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/14 2:49 PM
MOTION by Robert Lee Haller for Emergency Injunctive Relief (arb) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account
Tue 03/14 2:34 PM
Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Robert Lee Haller. (arb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Authorization To Release Institutional Account Information
Tue 03/14 2:32 PM
AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND TO PAY FILING FEE by Robert Lee Haller (arb) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Tue 03/14 2:25 PM
APPLICATION by Robert Lee Haller to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Wed 03/15 9:23 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |