Lasecki v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-03019 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2024 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Norman Lasecki
|
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Relief
Tue 02/27 9:15 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY. (src) |
|
18 | 18
![]() JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiff's case is dismissed with prejudice as set forth in the17 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 22, 2024. (bjb) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 22, 2024. (bjb) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Chainani on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Chainani, Tracey) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Norman Lasecki. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File ( Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/24/2023). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 5, 2023. (bjb) |
|
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File SSA Appeal Brief by Norman Lasecki. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - CDC
Fri 06/09 8:54 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the answer. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. The parties' briefs shall not contain a recitation of the procedural history, evidence, or standard of review. Plaintiffs brief shall be limited solely to the specific points for appeal and a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to those points (including transcript page citations for this evidence). Defendants brief shall address the issues raised in Plaintiffs brief and may include additional relevant issues, with a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to these issues (including transcript page citations for this evidence). A reply brief may be filed within fourteen (14) days after the response brief is filed, and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. All briefs must include citations to applicable case-law supporting the parties' positions. No extension of time to file a brief will be granted unless it is timely and establishes good cause for an extension. The briefs should be no longer than ten (10) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/10/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on June 9, 2023. (bmt) |
|
10 | 10
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due no later than 7/14/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 10, 2023. (bjb) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Mon 04/24 12:37 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Norman Lasecki. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Tue 03/14 12:15 PM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (bjb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 12:07 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 14, 2023. (cla) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/28/2023.(lgd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norman Lasecki. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Norman Lasecki.(Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Norman Lasecki. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd) |