Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Referred: Christy D Comstock
Case #: 4:23-cv-04034
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:May 22, 2023
Defendant
Evans
Defendant
Gulley
Defendant
John Doe Officers
Defendant
Rosso
Defendant
Taylor
Plaintiff
Christopher James Weston

GPO May 22 2023
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 22, 2023.(mll) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/23/2023) (bjb).

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/07 3:56 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender. Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Christopher James Weston at Hempstead County Detention Center including7 Order of Dismissal. No new address available.(mll)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order - Memo Order of Dismissal Mon 05/22 2:45 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 22, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
6 6 order Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY Tue 04/04 10:26 AM
TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to submit a completed IFP by April 3, 2023. (ECF No. 3). Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 4, 2023. (awl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/31 4:32 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. No longer here. Mail originally sent to Christopher James Weston at Hempstead County Detention Center including1 Complaint Referred (42:1983),2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983),Order Provisionally Filing Complaint,4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. No new address available. New Address due by 5/1/2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
utility Memo of Reassignment Mon 03/20 9:50 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(src)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Tue 03/14 11:42 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Provisionally Filing Complaint Tue 03/14 11:39 AM
ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically, the Court requires a completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 4/3/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 14, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Tue 03/14 11:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Christopher James Weston. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Tue 03/14 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Evans, Gulley, John Doe Officers, Rosso, Taylor filed by Christopher James Weston.(mll)
Related: [-]