Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Christy D Comstock
Case #: 2:23-cv-02036
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Defendant
Social Security Administration Commissioner
Interested Party
Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Plaintiff
Marlene D Fulmer

GPO Apr 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 5, 2024. (jlm) Modified on 4/19/2024 (src).
GPO Apr 05 2024
JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice as set forth in the 15 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 5, 2024. (jlm)

Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Friday, April 05, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Relief Fri 04/19 10:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY. (src)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Judgment - SSA Fri 04/05 2:50 PM
JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice as set forth in the15 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 5, 2024. (jlm)
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 04/05 2:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 5, 2024. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
14 14 misc Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt) Tue 10/10 11:29 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
13 13 misc Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff) Fri 09/08 12:51 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Marlene D Fulmer. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/11 10:06 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff Brief due by 9/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on August 11, 2023. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 motion Extend Thu 08/10 3:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief by Marlene D Fulmer. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
10 10 order Social Security Scheduling Order - CDC Tue 07/11 1:08 PM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the answer. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. The parties' briefs shall not contain a recitation of the procedural history, evidence, or standard of review. Plaintiffs brief shall be limited solely to the specific points for appeal and a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to those points (including transcript page citations for this evidence). Defendants brief shall address the issues raised in Plaintiffs brief and may include additional relevant issues, with a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to these issues (including transcript page citations for this evidence). A reply brief may be filed within fourteen (14) days after the response brief is filed, and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. All briefs must include citations to applicable case-law supporting the parties' positions. No extension of time to file a brief will be granted unless it is timely and establishes good cause for an extension. The briefs should be no longer than ten (10) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/10/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 11, 2023. (caz)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Social Security Transcript Tue 07/11 12:59 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Taylor, Candace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Part 2 of 5,
Att: 2 Supplement Part 3 of 5,
Att: 3 Supplement Part 4 of 5,
Att: 4 Supplement Part 5 of 5
Friday, May 12, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/12 3:14 PM
ORDER granting7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a responsive pleading re3 Complaint. Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 7/14/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 12, 2023. (tmc)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/12 2:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
utility Memo of Reassignment Mon 04/24 12:36 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/14 2:01 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 14, 2023. (cla)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/14 1:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marlene D Fulmer. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA Tue 03/14 1:31 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Marlene D Fulmer. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 03/14 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Marlene D Fulmer.(Caddell, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Magistrate Notice - SSA Tue 03/14 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/28/2023.(tmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/14 12:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marlene D Fulmer. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc)
Related: [-]
service Affidavit of Service as to USA Tue 03/14 2:05 PM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (tmc)
Related: [-]