California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:23-cv-00467
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court, San Diego County, 37-02022-00043271-CU-MC-CTL
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 4:00 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Lynn R Fiorentino
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Rachel Allison Remke
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-100
Defendant
Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.
Represented By
Lynn R Fiorentino
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Rachel Allison Remke
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Catherine J. Baumgartner
Arentfox Schiff
contact info
Plaintiff
Shasta Uhler
Represented By
Mark D. Potter
Potter Handy LLP
contact info
James M Treglio
Potter Handy, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2023
ORDER Granting 10 Joint Motion to Excuse Appearance of Amazon's Party Representative at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/5/2023. (hmw)
GPO Sep 01 2023
ORDER Granting In Part 29 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline, and Issuing FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/1/2023. (hmw)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/06 2:50 PM
ORDER Granting36 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/6/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
37 37 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/04 7:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint motion to dismiss36 , the Settlement Disposition Conference set for 3/8/2024 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/4/2024.(no document attached) (hmw)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Dismiss Mon 03/04 5:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and order of dismissal by Shasta Uhler.(Treglio, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 01/16 1:41 PM
ORDER Continuing Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of the parties' joint update, the SDC set for 1/18/2024 is reset for 3/8/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Joint email update due 3/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/16/2024.(hmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
34 34 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 11/15 3:18 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). SDC set for 1/18/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Joint email update due 1/16/2024. All other dates and deadlines, including the 11/29/2023 status conference, are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/15/2023.(hmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/06 9:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Shasta Uhler(Treglio, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, September 01, 2023
32 32 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/01 4:55 PM
ORDER Granting In Part29 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline, and Issuing FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/1/2023. (hmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
31 31 misc Status Report Wed 08/30 1:18 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Amazon.com Services LLC, Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
30 30 order Order Wed 08/23 9:37 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report re29 . As explained via email, the parties must file a Joint Status Report by 8/30/2023, with a joint list of all remaining discovery, including deadlines for completion of written discovery and firm dates for depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/23/2023.(no document attached) (hmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/21 8:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Subsequent Deadlines by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc..(Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lynn Fiorentino in support of Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete Fact Discovery,
Att: 2 Declaration of James Treglio in support of Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete Fact Discovery
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 08/16 4:30 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Rachel Allison Remke, re26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/16/2023.(rmc)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Wed 08/16 3:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Second Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/16/2023. The case did not settle, but the Court will continue to facilitate settlement discussions by issuing a Mediator's Proposal. (Plaintiff Attorney James M. Treglio). (Defendant Attorneys Catherine J. Baumgartner, Lynn Fiorentino, Rachel Remke, and Melissa Rose). (no document attached) (hmw)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/16 7:42 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18106554.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) Related [+] (rmc)
Related: [-] mke, Rachel
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Excuse Appearance Wed 08/09 2:20 PM
ORDER Granting24 Joint Motion to Excuse Appearance of Amazon's Party Representative at Second Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/9/2023. (hmw)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Excuse Appearance Wed 08/09 10:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Amazon.com Services LLC at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference of August 16, 2023, by Amazon.com Services LLC, Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
23 23 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 08/08 3:45 PM
ORDER Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC"), Time Change Only , and Modifying MSC to be Via Videoconference. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, MSC set for 3/20/2024 at 9:30 AM is RESET for 2:00 PM on the same date before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard via videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/8/2023.(hmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
22 22 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 07/27 1:03 PM
ORDER Granting In Part21 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/27/2023. (hmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
21 21 motion Protective Order Wed 07/26 11:35 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Shasta Uhler. (Treglio, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
20 20 order Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 05/16 9:54 AM
Minute Order : Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's19 MOTION to Withdraw her14 MOTION to Remand is GRANTED . Accordingly, the14 MOTION to Remand is hereby WITHDRAWN and the hearing scheduled for May 22, 2023 is VACATED . IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on May 16, 2023. (no document attached) (lkg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
19 19 motion Withdraw Mon 05/15 7:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw14 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof by Shasta Uhler.(Treglio, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/09 6:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc..(Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lynn Fiorentino in support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/09 6:08 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant is DIRECTED to file its opposition as a separate entry on the docket forthwith. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 05/09/2023. (kff)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 05/09 4:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc..(Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, April 20, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/20 7:42 AM
NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Shasta Uhler (Treglio, James) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
14 14 motion Remand Wed 04/12 10:13 PM
MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof by Shasta Uhler.(Treglio, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
13 13 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/12 11:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Second Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/16/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/12/2023.(hmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
12 12 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Tue 04/11 4:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 4/11/2023. The case did not settle. To facilitate further settlement discussions after discovery has been produced, the Court will set a second ENE. Scheduling Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney James M. Treglio). (Defendant Attorneys Catherine J. Baumgartner, Lynn Fiorentino, Rachel Remke, and Melissa Rose). (no document attached) (hmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Excuse Appearance Wed 04/05 1:14 PM
ORDER Granting10 Joint Motion to Excuse Appearance of Amazon's Party Representative at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/5/2023. (hmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
10 10 motion Excuse Appearance Tue 04/04 6:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Amazon.com Services LLC at April 11, 2023, 2:00 p.m., by Amazon.com Services LLC, Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc..(Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lynn Fiorentino In Support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Excuse Amazon.com Services LLC's Presence from the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Monday, April 03, 2023
9 9 misc Joint Hearing Statement Mon 04/03 8:41 PM
JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/21 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 4:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services LLC.. (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/15 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Removal to Federal Court by Amazon.com Services LLC (Fiorentino, Lynn)Attorney Lynn R Fiorentino added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
5 5 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 03/15 4:16 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC"). ENE set for 4/11/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/15/2023.(hmw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 11:04 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dorel Industries Inc. for Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc... (Fiorentino, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
3 3 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 03/15 10:04 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amazon.com Services LLC (mjw) (sjt)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 03/15 10:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.. (mjw) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/15 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17666928.), filed by Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc. The new case number is 3:23-cv-467-MMA-AHG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(mjw) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 27 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Dorel Home Furnishing Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Amazon.com Answer to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit D