GR Auto Services Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Janet E Bostwick |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10380 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 18, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | May 24, 2023 |
Dismissed: | Apr 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Debtor
GR Auto Services Inc.
261 R Mystic Avenue
Medford, MA 02155 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
John Aquino
Anderson Aquino LLP 240 Lewis Wharf
Boston, MA 02110 |
Docket last updated: 03/16/2023 12:16 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/15 1:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-10380 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A19973443, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 03/15 1:08 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by GR Auto Services Inc.. (Whynott, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
court
Matrix
Wed 03/15 1:24 PM
Matrix filed by Debtor GR Auto Services Inc. (Whynott, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b(Assets) (Use For Auto Assign Only)
Wed 03/15 4:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 4/18/2023 at 09:30 AM as a Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 5/24/2023. (ajta) |