Henry v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02037 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 02/28 10:01 AM
ORDER adopting22 Report and Recommendations. Further, granting19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is entitled to an award under the EAJA in the total amount of $6,407.40. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 28, 2024. (mjm) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/13 8:45 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Justin P Henry. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2024. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 13, 2024. (tmc) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response
Fri 02/09 1:56 PM
RESPONSE by Social Security Administration Commissioner re20 Memorandum Brief in Support,19 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Fischer, John) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/05 8:11 AM
CASE REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(mjm) |
||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Fri 02/02 9:22 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of19 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Justin P Henry. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 02/02 9:21 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Justin P Henry.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CPI 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CPI 2 | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - SSA
Wed 01/03 11:35 AM
JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 3, 2024. (mjm) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/03 11:31 AM
ORDER ADOPTING16 Report and Recommendations. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 3, 2024. (mjm) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 12/15 3:53 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Complaint filed by Justin P Henry. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2023. (jlm) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Fri 08/04 3:32 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Fischer, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/18 4:21 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief. The Government's SSA Appeal Brief is now due by 8/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 18, 2023. (cla) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/18 11:09 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Fischer, John) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/03 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Fischer on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Fischer, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Wed 06/21 1:01 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Justin P Henry.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit MER Abstract | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Social Security Transcript
Wed 05/17 4:30 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - MEF
Tue 05/16 10:28 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within (30) days of the date the transcript is filed. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. All briefs are limited to twenty (20) pages in length and must identify the specific points for appeal with references to the medical evidence supporting each point, transcript page numbers for all medical evidence referenced, and citations to case-law supporting the parties' positions. The briefs must also include the transcript page numbers of any duplicative and/or irrelevant medical records. Any brief found to be in noncompliance with these briefing rules may be stricken from the record. The Commissioner must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served , responding to the issues raised in the Plaintiff's brief. Additional relevant issues may also be raised, in accordance with the above briefing specifications and limitations. A reply brief may be filed within fourteen (14) days after the response brief is filed and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 16, 2023. (cla) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Social Security Transcript
Tue 05/16 8:12 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 04/05 12:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Motions terminated:6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Justin P Henry,4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Justin P Henry. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 5, 2023. (cla) |
|
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Wed 04/05 12:54 PM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (tmc) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/03 3:14 PM
Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin P Henry. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
misc
Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment
Fri 03/31 10:59 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (tmc) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Provisionally Filing Complaint
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Plaintiff has indicated that he is married but has provided no income information concerning his spouse. Without this information, his status as a pauper cannot be determined. Therefore, he is ORDERED to complete and file an Amended IFP Application with the Court on or before April 4, 2023. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 16, 2023. (cla) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin P Henry. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Justin P Henry.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Thu 03/16 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/30/2023.(tmc) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/16 1:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Justin P Henry. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc) |