Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:P K Holmes III
Case #: 5:23-cv-05040
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Dean of the University of Miami School of Law
Defendant
President of the University of Miami School of Law
Defendant
University of Miami School of Law
Plaintiff
Ronald Satish Emrit
6655 38th Lane East
Sarasota, FL 34242

GPO Mar 27 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 27, 2023. (lgd)
GPO Apr 17 2023
ORDER adopting in its entirety 9 Report and Recommendations. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 17, 2023. (mjm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 17, 2023
11 11 order Judgment Mon 04/17 2:39 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order entered in this case on this date, IT IS CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 17, 2023. (mjm)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 04/17 2:36 PM
ORDER adopting in its entirety9 Report and Recommendations. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 17, 2023. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 03/27 11:37 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 27, 2023. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service Thu 03/23 10:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; deferring ruling on5 Motion for Service. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 23, 2023. (smg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
7 7 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Thu 03/16 10:30 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Motions Referred Thu 03/16 10:26 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock:5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; MOTION for Service filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (bjb)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service Thu 03/16 10:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Ronald Satish Emrit. (bjb)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Provisionally Filing Complaint Thu 03/16 10:08 AM
ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds the complaint should be provisionally filed prior to a determination regarding Plaintiff's status as a pauper and service of process. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 16, 2023. (bjb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/16 10:05 AM
***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (bjb) Modified on 3/16/2023 (bjb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dean of the University of Miami School of Law, President of the University of Miami School of Law, University of Miami School of Law, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit.(bjb)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/16 10:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ronald Satish Emrit. (bjb)
Related: [-]