Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC v. Goldcrest Farms, LLC
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04035 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Miller County Circuit Court, 46CV-23-00022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:21 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Goldcrest Farms, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldcrest Farms, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Protective Order
Tue 04/16 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order For Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(Larkin, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer/Reply to Amended Counterclaim
Mon 02/26 4:27 PM
ANSWER/REPLY to19 Amended Counterclaim, by Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC.(Hoskins, Wendell) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Counterclaim
Mon 02/05 2:10 PM
AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM as to4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC terminating Goldcrest Farms, LLC, filed by Goldcrest Farms, LLC. Related document:4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(Shannon, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Mon 02/05 12:47 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(e), Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff must file their amended counterclaims (ECF No. 15-1) within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 5, 2024.(mll) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 01/22 1:09 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. The new deadline for initial expert witness disclosures is February 21, 2024. The new deadline for rebuttal expert witness disclosures is April 6, 2024. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 22, 2024.(mll) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend
Fri 01/19 4:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Goldcrest Farms, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Leave
Fri 01/19 11:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Counterclaim by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(Shannon, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Errata A | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Final Scheduling Order
Wed 09/27 3:07 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 8/19/2024 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 27, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 07/25 11:49 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Goldcrest Farms, LLC. (Larkin, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 2:20 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 7/19/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/26/2023. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2024 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 21, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer/Reply to Counterclaim
Mon 04/17 4:50 PM
RED ROCK PIPELINE & IRRIGATION, LLC'S ANSWER/REPLY to4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC.(Hoskins, Wendell) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/05 2:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 17, 2023. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 5, 2023. (cha) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/05 9:00 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC. (Hoskins, Wendell) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of Goldcrest Farms, LLC. (Quattlebaum, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Larkin on behalf of Goldcrest Farms, LLC. (Larkin, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Thu 03/16 4:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldcrest Farms, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 03/16 2:48 PM
STATE COURT ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(mll) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:44 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Goldcrest Farms, LLC filed by Red Rock Pipeline & Irrigation, LLC.(mll) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County Circuit Court, case number 46CV-23-22 filed by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(mll) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Complaint & Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - Arkansas Secretary of State, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. 3 - Answer and Counterclaim | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/16 2:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Goldcrest Farms, LLC.(mll) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Thu 03/16 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/20/2023.(mll) |
||
notice
Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading
Thu 03/16 2:54 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Goldcrest Farms, LLC. Notice of Removal2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Steven W. Quattlebaum, Glenn Larkin .(mll) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Thu 03/16 4:20 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2746892.. (Shannon, Michael) |