Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 5:23-cv-05042
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:34 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Springdale Public Schools
Represented By
James M. Graves
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner
contact info
Steven S. Zega
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Berkley Assurance Company
Represented By
James Price Collins
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman Dicker LLP
contact info
Chris Gabriel
Wilson Elser
contact info
Lisa M. Wilson
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman Dicker L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Alissa Cawood
Represented By
Joshua D. Gillispie
Green & Gillispie, Attorneys At Law
contact info
Alan L. Lane
Odom & Elliott
contact info
Hannah Hungate
Odom Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Mark Oesterle
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Myers
Taylor Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Rollins
Represented By
James M. Graves
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner
contact info
Charles L Harwell
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner
contact info
Steven S. Zega
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Springdale Public Schools
Represented By
James M. Graves
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner
contact info
Charles L Harwell
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner
contact info
Steven S. Zega
Crouch, Harwell, Fryar & Ferner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Berkley Assurance Company
Represented By
James Price Collins
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman Dicker LLP
contact info
Chris Gabriel
Wilson Elser
contact info
Lisa M. Wilson
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman Dicker L.L.P.
contact info

GPO Feb 17 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 17, 2024. (Brooks, Timothy) Modified docket text on 2/21/2024 (tmc).

Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
43 43 order Judgment Tue 02/20 11:31 AM
JUDGMENT - Case DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 20, 2024. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 17, 2024
42 42 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Sat 02/17 12:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING32 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 17, 2024. (Brooks, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
41 41 order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 08/24 3:01 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting40 Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 24, 2023. (ee)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Leave Thu 08/24 10:44 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Amended Reply to Springdale & Rollins' Response to BAC's Motion for Summary Judgment by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/24 8:36 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Springdale & Rollins) filed by Berkley Assurance Company.(Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/23 4:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Springdale's & Joseph Rollins's) filed by Berkley Assurance Company.(Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts
37 37 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/23 4:35 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Mark Oesterle's) filed by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
36 36 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/16 2:23 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Rollins, Springdale Public Schools. (Zega, Steven)
Related: [-]
35 35 msupport Statement of Facts Wed 08/16 1:33 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of34 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Mark Oesterle. (Myers, Andrew)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/16 1:32 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Oesterle. (Myers, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
33 33 16 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Wed 08/02 4:03 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of32 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Berkley Assurance Company.(Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Wed 08/02 3:58 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
31 31 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/25 9:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hannah Hungate withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his/her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 25, 2023. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
30 30 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 07/24 11:10 AM
MOTION of Hannah L. Hungate to Withdraw as Attorney by Alissa Cawood.(Hungate, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Withdraw
Thursday, July 06, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Hearings Thu 07/06 4:45 PM
ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/29/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to CDCsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 6, 2023. (rg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
28 28 order Final Scheduling Order Fri 06/30 8:11 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. BENCH TRIAL set for 8/19/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 30, 2023. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
27 27 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/28 10:35 AM
OPINION AND ORDER granting19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Separate Defendants' counterclaims for declaratory judgment, fraud, constructive fraud, false misrepresentation, and bad faith are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Separate Defendants' counterclaim for breach of contract remains. (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 28, 2023. (lgd)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Case Management Hearing Wed 06/28 9:59 AM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 6/28/2023. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter) (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
25 25 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 06/14 4:41 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Berkley Assurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/05 2:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Springdale and Rollins Counterclaims) filed by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
23 23 7 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Tue 05/30 2:37 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of22 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Joseph Rollins, Springdale Public Schools. (Zega, Steven)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Tue 05/30 2:35 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Springdale and Rollins Counterclaims) filed by Joseph Rollins, Springdale Public Schools. (Zega, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Tue 05/16 11:55 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Berkley Assurance Company.(Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
20 20 8 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Tue 05/16 11:52 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Springdale and Rollins Counterclaims) by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/16 11:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Springdale and Rollins Counterclaims) by Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/15 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Gillispie on behalf of Alissa Cawood. (Gillispie, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/11 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L Harwell on behalf of Joseph Rollins, Springdale Public Schools. (Harwell, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/04 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Zega on behalf of Joseph Rollins, Springdale Public Schools. (Zega, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
15 15 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 05/03 1:00 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/28/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/14/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 3, 2023. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Mon 05/01 10:15 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Alissa Cawood.(Hungate, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Counterclaim Wed 04/26 10:15 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Separate Defendants Springdale Public Schools and Joseph Rollins , First COUNTERCLAIM by Springdale Public Schools and Joseph Rollins against Berkley Assurance Company by Springdale Public Schools.(Graves, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Denial Letter from Plaintiff
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/11 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Gabriel on behalf of Berkley Assurance Company. (Gabriel, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/10 4:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. CHRIS GABRIEL is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 10, 2023. (slc)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/10 11:02 AM
MOTION for Attorney Chris Gabriel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2758897) by Berkley Assurance Company.(Collins, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order on Pro Hac Admission
Friday, March 31, 2023
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/31 10:07 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Berkley Assurance Company. Alissa Cawood was sent waiver on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Collins, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Wed 03/29 2:49 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Mark Oesterle.(Myers, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/28 9:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Berkley Assurance Company. Mark Oesterle was sent waiver on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Collins, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/27 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Berkley Assurance Company. Joseph Rollins was sent waiver on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Collins, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/27 3:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Berkley Assurance Company. Springdale Public Schools was sent waiver on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Collins, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Mon 03/20 12:43 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
NOTICE by Berkley Assurance Company BAC's FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Collins, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 03/20 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Berkley Assurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2748369), filed by Berkley Assurance Company.(Collins, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 17, 2023
1 1 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/17 10:25 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Berkley Assurance Company. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd)
Related: [-]