Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Patrick R Wyrick
Case #: 5:23-cv-00246
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Bridgestone Retail Operation INC
Represented By
Harris A Phillips, III
Pettigrew, Lewis, & Phillips, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE, 1
Defendant
JOHN DOE, 2
Defendant
JOHN DOE, 3
Defendant
JOHN DOE, 4
Defendant
JOHN DOE, 5
Defendant
Giti Tire USA LTD
Represented By
Allison J Maynard
Wilson Elder Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker-Dallas
contact info
Defendant
TP Gajah Tunggal TBK
Plaintiff
Maria Hale
Represented By
David A Burrage
Burrage Law Firm
contact info
Leslie C Wesberry, Jr
Burrage Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bridgestone Americas Inc
Terminated: 05/26/2023
Defendant
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operation
Terminated: 05/26/2023
Defendant
Bridgestone Corporation
Terminated: 05/26/2023


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
55 55 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Blake Hawkins on behalf of Maria Hale(Administrator of the Estate of Ryan Michael Hale Deceased) (Hawkins, Scott)
Related: [-]
54 54 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:03 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by John B Norman on behalf of Maria Hale(Administrator of the Estate of Ryan Michael Hale Deceased) (Norman, John)
Related: [-]