Allen v. Hopebridge, LLC
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-05043 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hopebridge, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 01/03 12:32 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting35 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 3, 2024. (tg) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/03 11:58 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice by Hopebridge, LLC. (Duke, Melissa) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
Fri 07/28 10:32 AM
ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to CDCsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 28, 2023. (rg) |
|
33 | 33
order
Final Scheduling Order
Fri 07/28 9:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. JURY TRIAL set for 10/28/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 28, 2023. (slc) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Case Management Hearing
Wed 07/26 12:48 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 7/26/2023. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter) (slc) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion of Judgment
Tue 06/27 4:15 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for partial judgment on the pleadings and Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 27, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Mon 06/26 2:06 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 26, 2023. (slc) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Protective Order
Fri 06/23 12:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Hopebridge, LLC.(Simpson, Ross) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Protective Order | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr on behalf of Brittany Allen. (Humphrey, Marion) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
6
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Fri 06/09 4:25 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of26 MOTION for Judgment Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Hopebridge, LLC. (Simpson, Ross) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Judgment
Fri 06/09 4:23 PM
MOTION for Judgment Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Hopebridge, LLC. (Simpson, Ross) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/08 3:02 PM
ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint, by Hopebridge, LLC.(Simpson, Ross) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 06/02 12:52 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hopebridge, LLC. (Simpson, Ross) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/30 10:30 AM
TEXT ONLY AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to21 Amended Complaint, against Hopebridge, LLC, filed by Brittany Allen. Related documents:2 Complaint and21 Amended Complaint, filed by Brittany Allen. *THIS EVENT WAS USED TO CORRECTLY ALIGN PARTIES FOR DOCKET SHEET MAINTENANCE ONLY*(hnc) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 05/26 2:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due to the filing of an amended complaint21 . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 26, 2023. (ee) |
|
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/26 2:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to2 Complaint against Brittany Allen Brittany Allen , filed by Brittany Allen. Related document:2 Complaint filed by Brittany Allen.(Humphrey, Marion) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A_C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits D_EEOC Position Statement | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 05/26 9:41 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file the proposed amended complaint attached to the Motion. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 26, 2023. (ee) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 05/25 7:29 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Brittany Allen by Brittany Allen.(Humphrey, Marion) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A_C, | ||
Att: 3 Errata Exhibit D | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Thu 05/25 3:55 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER denying15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff failed to attach to the motion a copy of the proposed amended complaint, in violation of Local Rule 5.5(e). Plaintiff may file a renewed motion that attaches her proposed amended pleading, and the Court will consider it. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 25, 2023. (ee) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
9
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 05/24 10:40 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of16 Response to Motion by Brittany Allen. (Humphrey, Marion) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 05/24 10:39 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Brittany Allen filed by Brittany Allen. (Humphrey, Marion) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Wed 05/24 10:36 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend2 Complaint Brittany Allen by Brittany Allen. (Humphrey, Marion) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
Thu 05/18 4:54 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (counsel request): Case Management Hearing reset for 7/26/2023 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: All deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order remain. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 18, 2023. (slc) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 05/08 12:27 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/30/2023 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 8, 2023. (slc) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
12
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 05/03 2:10 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Hopebridge, LLC. (Duke, Melissa) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 05/03 2:09 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Hopebridge, LLC. (Duke, Melissa) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Wed 05/03 2:07 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Hopebridge, LLC.(Duke, Melissa) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/14 10:27 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Defendants' new answer deadline is May 3, 2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 14, 2023. (ee) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 04/12 2:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Hopebridge, LLC. (Duke, Melissa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/12 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Simpson on behalf of All Defendants. (Simpson, Ross) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McJunkins Duke on behalf of All Defendants. (Duke, Melissa) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 03/20 9:03 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 8:44 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Hopebridge, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Sat 03/18 12:23 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Brittany Allen for service of the following document: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Complaint. (Humphrey, Marion) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/18 12:19 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Brittany Allen against Hopebridge, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2747757), filed by Brittany Allen.(Humphrey, Marion) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 2:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brittany Allen. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd) |