USA v. Peter Navarro
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02292
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cvus-05062 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Peter K. Navarro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 5:07 AM EDT |
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 23-5062 | ||
28 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1991676] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02292-CKK filed by Peter K. Navarro. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 23-5062 23-5062 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1991691] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/24/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/08/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/24/2023. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/24/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/24/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/08/2023 23-5062 | ||
1 pgs ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1991720] filed by Jennifer L. Utrecht and co-counsel Gerard Sinzdak on behalf of Appellee USA. 23-5062 (Utrecht, Jennifer) |