Howard et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01190 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-01642 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2023 10:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda and Anthony Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Turner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cloid Fretwell, Peter Hegre, Duncan Kelly, Christopher Meadows, Deanna Springhetti, Milton Baxter, David Staud, Gary Stolz, Agapito Arredondo, Victor Atkinson, Richard Garcia, Jennifer Havard, Keith Johnson, Francisco Juarez, Tim Martin, Ricky Murphy, Rickey Oneal, Joseph Polk, Bernard Robinson, Agabita Rowe, Douglas Whitman, Robert Goodson, Isiah Martin, John McDavid Sr, Louis McHenry, Jackie Rodgers, Robert Thomas, Clyde Turney, Christine Marie Vaughn, Mark Greuling, Zebedee Johnson, Aaron Sarver, Steve Acheson, Howard Brill, Duane Brucker, Henry Burnett, Preston Cadwalder, Steve De Simone, Robert Gibson, Willie Green, John Greenaway, Terry Redden, Gerald Sandvik, Larry Rocky Martin, Kim Moten, Leon Phillips, Bandy Smiley, Timothy Waggoner, Edward Williams Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Pdschun without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Podschun, Benjamin; Serkin, Warren; Gonzales, Salvador P.; McCowen, JD; Charles, Roberta; Robertson, James; Craddock, Kerry; Gesse, Michael; Gibbs, Gary; Kerfoot, Jimmy; Ramirez, Roger H; Wilkerson, Danny; Gibson, Kenneth; Alonzo, Miguel; Howard, Amy; Martinez, Anthony; Turner, Jessica; Barnes, Timothy W.; Burton, Roger R; Callender, Anthony R; Conti, Carolyn; Dunn, Douglas; Fuller, Luz; Gillenwater, Mark; Hanes, KathyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 3/27/2023), 1:23-cv-01642, Howard et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01190-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 03/27 2:12 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-01642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 03/27 2:18 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 3/27/2023), 1:23-cv-01642, Howard et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01190-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Saturday, March 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/13/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | |
4 | 4 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) Modified on 3/25/2023 (vba). Modified on 3/25/2023 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | |
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | ||
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 55901/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27395856).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |