Duster et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01242 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00293 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 10:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Gary Michael Cummings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Page Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Frank Curcuro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael George Curran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Bruce Curry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Curry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Robert Cutter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Czarnylas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aldo Donato D'Agostino, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent J D'Alessandro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert William Daem
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Alonza Dale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth John Danelski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Robert Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Eugene Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Marshall Daniels, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reno Jean Daret, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Allen Darrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Reuben Daunce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Quinn Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Lee Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank L Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Dean Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Dean Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lyle Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark William Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fred Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Lynn Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve James Davis, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Douglas Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvester Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Terrell Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Lynn Davlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benny Lame Dawes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Eaton Day
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Stanley Day
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy James Deakins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Joseph Deangelo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deric Garland Dear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Mitchell Deck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Thomas Defouw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Paul Deines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Joseph Delahunty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Phillip Delgrosso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Dellinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Delvalle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Larry Demetro, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Raymond Demeulenaere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Arthur Denham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Paul Depalma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Deptuch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Derr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Joseph Derylak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Louis Desmarais
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Julien Desrosiers, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Reynolds Devaul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert James Devers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James W Dewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmer Manuel Dickens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Whitaker Dickens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Darnell Dickerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David William Dickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy McDowell Dickson, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Jerome Diggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Digiacomo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward George Dirkes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Joseph Dirusso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mark Dittmeier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clyde Dobson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Edward Doherty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Richard Domini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Joseph Donnelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Patrick Donovan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Hurcules Dorsey, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Wilson Dothard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Wayne Dotson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall Eugene Doughty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Bruce Dowd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Draughn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Nelson Drew, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorsey Leroy Driggers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Joseph Driggers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Dale Drinkard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Wallace Driskell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Drury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Raymond Ducharme
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Adolph Duerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Dee Dufour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Carver Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lilton Eugene Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Wayne Duncan, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl Timothy Dunlap
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nedward Bruce Dunnington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Dunscombe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Fenton Dunspaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L Duquette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Louis Duster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gregory Dutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Anthony Dzwlewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Wesley Eanes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David James Early
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grady Oscar Early
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Easter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Joseph Eck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Allen Eckard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erwin Norman Ecker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph J Eckstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Ray Edmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Lee Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenton Louis Eicher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Grant Ellem
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Thomas Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Madison Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger L Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Wade Elsesser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Marie Enbody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Byron Enders, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Earl Ensley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Joseph Ercole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Dubiel
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Michael A Demarco
Terminated: 07/19/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mason Brookshire Dement
Terminated: 06/23/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Franklin Emanuel
Terminated: 06/01/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dominick Frazia, Kevin O. Goins, Steven James Hart, Issac Hatton, Roger Ralph Reed, Richard Bryan Shearin, Michael Sherman, James Smith, Michael E Smith, Desi D Wade, Robert Thomas Welch, Lawrence Edward Wells, Frank Edward White, Sr, Michael William Stockton, David A Wrightson, Raymond Roger Ramsey, William Edward Carr, James Ray Carwile, Neil Colosi, Frank Sefl, Jr, Ildebarando Boby Francone, Thomas Joseph Futterer, Russell Ackerman, Richard F Blackford, Ralph Charles Alario, II, Kenneth Aman, Jose Pabalan Bautista, Gene Spencer, John Joseph Sweeney, Lee Richard Tague, Gary Martin Blasingame, Senator Madison Brunson, Nelson Blaine Burk, Mitchell Clay McDonald, Jr, Stephen Brad McLaughlin, Jeffrey D Meddin, Greg Miller, Lawrence Mitchell Moore, Bruce Lester Morgan, William Niefer, John N Peterson, Michael Patrick Donovan, Joe Louis Duster, Michael Alan Chance, Anthony Creen, Brently Ian Dorsey, Michael Doust, Rajah Echols, Anthony D Elzy, Perry Jerome Fields Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Allen Johnson, Sr, Lloyd Randal Lowe, Stephen Walter Miller, Gregory Mark Mullaley, Elijah James Oliver, Janice Winchester, Eric Firdaus Weilenman, Charles Carlyle Whitmore, Jr, Philip Miles Peacock, Charles Garry Penhale, Abel Perez, Robert Elroy Richards, Jr, Sean Craig Ronsen, Sr, Steven Allen Ross, William Louis Schaff, Jr, Michael Paul Sexton, Charles Edward Shannon, Joe Lynn Wooley, Robert Duane Colt, John Rico Cortest, Richard Andrew Couvillon, Jr, Gregory John Crispo, John Charles Fields, Johnnie Winston Busby, Teriko J Adams, Carlie Adams Mosley, Maria Quintans Godfrey, Betty Louise Thomas, Esther Lynn Gomes, Edward J Fitzgerald, Willie James Allen, Demetris Batts, Patrick James Baumgard, John Keith Berry, James P Smith, Leonard Vaughn Steving, Fred B. Stewart, Gerard Sullivan, Dennis Albert O'Key, Mundo Valez Olford, Cynthia Carner, Wesley Scott Bitner, Gary Dean Brabant, Gary Paul Broughton, Harold Gregory Brown, Sr, David Quinn Davis, Larry Darnell Dickerson, Robert Raymond Ducharme, Sandra Conley, Robert Cott Cook Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lonnie Paul Brandt, Dennis Caldwell, Roy Davis, Michael Wayne Duncan, Sr, Richard Joseph Ercole, Harlow Cisco, Johnson Griffin, Sheldon T Griffin, Roy Grimm, Richard Gromacki, Joseph Frank Guerrieri, Rodolfo Gutierrez, Benjamin Lawton Hall, William E Hamilton, Karl Hampton, Willis Hampton, Gregory L Haney, Michael Hathorn, Brian Hayes, Scott Heinrich, Donald Helms, Dale Helphrey, Kenneth E Henry, William Herbert, Victor E Hinds, John Hokavar, Frederick Carl Hoke, Timmy Joe Holcomb, James S Hull, Lance J Ideker, Mitchell Jacobs, Ray James, Aloysius Donald John, William I John, David Kausak, Scott W Kaveloh, Alex Kincy, Thomas Kirkpatrick, Steven B Knox, Steven Kufner, Stephen Kuljis, Paul Lagala, JC Lambert, Brenton P Lebish, Danny Leis, Ronald C Liles, Joseph Gregory Litcher, Merle Lloyd, Danny Lee Addison, Millard Atchley WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Edward Booton, John Brown, Teodoro Buenrostro, Sr, Alan Walter Burke, Stewart Brian Butler, Raymond George Cabana, Jr, Dennis Caldwell, David Camacho, Mark William Davis, Walter Terrell Davis, Roger Thomas Defouw, Kevin Joseph Delahunty, George Drury, Pamela Dee Dufour, Ralph J Eckstein, Raymond Lee Edwards, Wallace Werneigk Goodey, III, Tommy O'Brian Gore, Anthony Wayne Graham, Perry Grier, Robert Stoner Guthrie, Paul Steven Gutierrez, Royce Edward Harper, Frank Spencer Harriman, Robert Lee Hartzler, Thomas William Hensel, Jr, Steven R Hinton, Charles Edward Hislop, Jr, Sammy William Hukkanen, Dylan Lee James, Darl Wayne Jewell, Jr, Greg Evan Johnson, Derwin Clifton Jones, Robert Karcher, Franklin Austin Kelley, Sr, Jerry Matthew Keltner, Kenneth Wayne Kingsley, Roderick Keith Leverett, Sr, James William Lofland, Sr, Thurman David Logan, Mark Lavern Casey, Daniel Christopher Caulk, John Anthony Chavez, David R. Clark, Thomas William Coyne, Hilton Vern Crocker, John Matthew Abboud, James Ray Baldridge, Donald Aldei Bechard, James Walter Benjamin WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/01 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gregg William Hamilton, Daniel Lee Hansen, Edward Morris Harper, III, Simmer Harry, Michael Eugene Harter, Frank Albert Heinrich, Bruce Lane Higbee, Kurt Warren Hinkle, Frank Arthur Hooks, Johnny Leroy Hullum, Lawrence N Hume, William Charles Jenkins, Donald Emery Jensen, Raymond Alix Jodoin, Steven Arthur John, Eric Wayne Johnson, Marshall David Joyner, Douglas James King, Robert Summers Lawrence, Larry James Logan, Joseph Lutz, Jay Everett Mabry, Nina Manning, James Harrison Matthews, John Terrell May, Matthew John McCabe, Bruce Edward McDonald, Steven Michael Bush, Arthur Lamar Cainion, Sr, Jacob C Callier, Jr, Ali Abdullah Canada, Thomas Lee Cannon, Matt Czarnylas, Vincent J D'Alessandro, Thomas Reuben Daunce, James Eaton Day, Marion Stanley Day, Kenneth Mitchell Deck, Robert Paul Deines, Gary Dellinger, Michael Larry Demetro, Sr, Robert Louis Desmarais, Paul Reynolds Devaul, James Dixon, Larry Hurcules Dorsey, Sr, Charles Wilson Dothard, Karl Timothy Dunlap, Ronald Byron Enders, Sr Napoleon Gordon as to Leak, et al; David King as to Leak, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01240-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG, 2:23-cv-01472-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/24 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Robert Hudler, Charles Bruce Curry, Charles Alonza Dale, Larry Eugene Daniels, Michael Fred Davis, Sylvester Davis, Benny Lame Dawes, Roy James Deakins, John Joseph Deangelo, Carlos Delvalle, James Paul Depalma, Walter Deptuch, Frank Joseph Derylak, Raymond Julien Desrosiers, Jr, Robert James Devers, James W Dewitt, Elmer Manuel Dickens, Larry Darnell Dickerson, David William Dickson, Roy McDowell Dickson, III, Edward George Dirkes, Michael Edward Doherty, Robert Richard Domini, William Joseph Donnelly, Philip Bruce Dowd, David Draughn, John Adolph Duerr, Joe Louis Duster, Robert Gregory Dutton, David James Early, Matthew Allen Eckard, Erwin Norman Ecker, Lee Grant Ellem, James Paul Carozza, Phillip Arthur Carroll, Steven Michael Costello, David Eugene Crabb, Kenneth Douglas Cunningham, Jerel Lamar Davis, Mark Stephen Doss, Samuel Matthew Dresel, II, John Robert Eeten, Jr, Lamar Elston, Francis Joseph Fennessy, Jr, Jack Charles Crookshanks, Steven Lee Crump, John Andrew Culberson, Glen Theodore Cullen, Larry Layne Eshleman, Philip Thomas Esposito WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/17 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Frank Bilski, Richard Charles Bizek, William Louis Boone, Glenn Edward Borst, Walter Ira Bowman, James Elsworth Bradford, Aaron Brasher, Erna Dare Bright, Jr, Charles Eugene Britt, Charles Raymond Brown, Clinton Keith Brown, Sr, James Eugene Brown, Richard Jean Brown, Jr, Willis Edward Brumley, Charles Moulton Bruno, Charles Kenneth Buccino, Roger Ray Buckingham, Rhett David Buehler, Leslie Wayne Busby, Merel Bradford Butts, Eddie Darris Caldwell, Douglas James Campbell, Marvin Odell Campbell, Michael George Curran, Kenneth John Danelski, Leroy Marshall Daniels, Jr, Reno Jean Daret, III, David Allen Darrow, Eddie Lee Davis, Gregory Dean Davis, Jeffrey Dean Davis, Michael Lynn Davis, Steve James Davis, III, Deric Garland Dear, William Arthur Denham, Francis Derr, Kevin Jerome Diggs, John Joseph Dirusso, James Mark Dittmeier, William Nelson Drew, Jr, Dorsey Leroy Driggers, David Wallace Driskell, David Carver Duncan, Richard Fenton Dunspaugh, David L Duquette, Mark Wesley Eanes, John Ray Edmond, Kenton Louis Eicher, Phillip Thomas Elliott, Charles Wade Elsesser, Ricky Earl Ensley WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01240-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/18 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Phillip Delgrosso WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Wed 11/08 5:14 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Duster, et al. v. 3M Co. et al. Case No. 2:23-cv-1242-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute Glenn Hissong for Decedent as a Plaintiff to this action (Dkt. No. 3883 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (18) in case 2:23-cv-01242-RMG) is granted. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/8/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 10/31 11:15 AM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Janet Marie Enbody. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate | ||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/19 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael A Demarco WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 07/10 2:09 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Duster et al. v. 3M Co. et al., Case No. 2:23-cv-1242-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute Joan Dubiel for Daniel James Dubiel (Dkt. No. 3348 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (12) in case 2:23-cv-01242-RMG) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(sshe, ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/10/2023) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/10/2023 to correct member case caption(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 06/27 12:25 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Daniel James Dubiel. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mason Brookshire Dement Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/01 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Franklin Emanuel Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01242-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 3/29/2023), 2:23-cv-00293, Duster et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01242-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 03/30 3:07 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00293. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 3/30/2023.] | |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 3/15/2023 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 3/30/2023.] | |
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of a case to a U. S. magistrate judge for trial. (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 3/30/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4290799. B-4161, related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by 3M Company.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 3/30/2023.] | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by 3M Company.(KAM) Modified on 3/14/2023 (CTF).[Transferred from Alabama Northern on 3/30/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A part 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B |