New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:23-bk-12825
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2023
Dismissed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
LTL Management LLC
501 George Street
New Brunswick, NJ 08933
Represented By
Paul R. DeFilippo
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102

GPO Jul 28 2023
Opinion Granting Motions to Dismiss (related document:286 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bankruptcy not filed in good faith filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Talc Claimants, 335 Motion re: AD HOC GROUP OF MESOTHELIOMA CLAIMANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND BANKRUPTCY PETITION OF LTL MANAGEMENT filed by Attorney Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd LLC, 346 Motion re: Motion to Dismiss Petition filed by Interested Party Paul Crouch, 350 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bankruptcy not filed in good faith filed by Creditor The Ad Hoc Committee of States Holding Consumer Protection Claims, 352 Support filed by Creditor Various Talc Claimants, Interested Party Various Talc Claimants, 358 Motion re: Dismiss filed by Creditor Various Talc Claimants, Interested Party Various Talc Claimants, Attorney Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd LLC, 379 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re: for cause pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, 384 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bankruptcy Not Filed in Good Faith filed by Creditor Arnold & Itkin LLP, 473 Document filed by Creditor Claimants Represented by Barnes Law Group, LLC, 480 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith Under Section 1112(b) filed by Interested Party State of Mississippi, Interested Party State of New Mexico).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/28/2023. (dmi)
GPO Nov 07 2023
Letter Opinion Resolving Outstanding Fee Applications and Substantial Contribution Motion (related document:1241 Motion re: of the Ad Hoc Committee of Certain Talc Claimants and the Official Committee of Talc Claimants for Allowance of Administrative Claims for Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from April 4, 2023 through April 14, 2023 (Prior to th filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Talc Claimants, Creditor Ad Hoc Committee of Certain Talc Claimants, 1341 Final Application for Compensation for Massey & Gail LLP, Special Counsel, period: 4/4/2023 to 8/11/2023, fee: $2,137,547.00, expenses: $8,110.75. filed by Spec. Counsel Massey & Gail LLP, 1347 Final Application for Compensation for Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., Other Professional, period: 4/14/2023 to 8/11/2023, fee: $3,363,709.68, expenses: $2,786.36. filed by Other Prof. Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/7/2023. (wiq)

Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 04/07 12:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/7/2025 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 1970 Final Application for Compensation for Massey & Gail LLP, Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2024 to 11/30/2024, fee: $200,194.59, expenses: $0.00. Filed by Massey & Gail LLP. Hearing scheduled for 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (Attachments: #1 Final Post-Dismissal Fee Application of Massey & Gail LLP, Special Counsel to the Official Committee of Talc Claimants, for Allowances of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of June 1, 2024 through November 30, 2024 #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Exhibit C #5 Exhibit D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Proposed Order Granting Allowances) Filed by Spec. Counsel Massey & Gail LLP