California Southern District Court
Judge:Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:23-cv-00639
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:1383 Review of HHS Decision (regarding payment of benefits)
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Defendant
Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff
Anh Tuyet Thai

GPO Dec 18 2023
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reversing and Remanding for Further Proceedings 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/18/2023. (bdc)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/11 11:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 Ex Parte MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Anh Tuyet Thai.(Manbeck, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, April 04, 2025
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 8:51 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 Ex Parte MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Leland Dudek. (Langkamer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Mon 03/24 10:46 AM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule Related [+]: Responses due by 4/4/2025. Replies due by 4/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/24/2025.(rxc)
Related: [-] ECF No.24
Sunday, March 23, 2025
24 24 motion Attorney Fees Sun 03/23 8:45 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Attorney Fees by Anh Tuyet Thai.(Manbeck, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
23 23 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 01/28 12:17 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to18 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Anh Tuyet Thai (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dim)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Order Tue 01/28 12:16 PM
MEMORANDUM of USCA as to18 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Anh Tuyet Thai (dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 6:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Langkamer on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Langkamer, Joseph)Attorney Joseph John Langkamer added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
20 20 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Mon 01/22 12:47 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to18 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Anh Tuyet Thai. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 2/16/2024 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 3/18/2024.) (cc: Court Reporter). (dim)(jrd)
Related: [-]
19 19 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 01/22 12:46 PM
USCA Case Number: 24-329 for18 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Anh Tuyet Thai.(dim)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Appellate Mentoring Program,
Att: 4 Appellate Practice Guide
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
18 18 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Wed 01/17 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to17 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Anh Tuyet Thai., IFP Status (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Manbeck, Alexandra) (dim)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 20 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 12/18 2:04 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reversing and Remanding for Further Proceedings12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/18/2023. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
16 16 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 12/11 3:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv639 BLM.(no document attached) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
15 15 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 08/31 12:00 AM
RESPONSE in Support re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Anh Tuyet Thai.(Manbeck, Alexandra) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
14 14 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/16 11:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Phillips, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/07 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance and Terminating Oscar Gonzalez de Llano by Jacob P. Phillips on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Phillips, Jacob)Attorney Jacob P. Phillips added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Wed 07/26 11:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Anh Tuyet Thai.(Manbeck, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Thursday, July 06, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Thu 07/06 3:48 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/20 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/08 2:30 PM
ORDER setting Mandatory Settlement procedures and briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/08/2023.(jpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 misc Administrative Record Wed 06/07 4:30 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD .(Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Pages 1-85,
Att: 3 Pages 86-118,
Att: 4 Pages 119-183,
Att: 5 Pages 184-185,
Att: 6 Pages 186-202,
Att: 7 Pages 203-280,
Att: 8 Pages 281-355,
Att: 9 Pages 356-428,
Att: 10 Pages 429-480,
Att: 11 Pages 481-531,
Att: 12 Pages 532-585,
Att: 13 Pages 586-600,
Att: 14 Pages 601-657,
Att: 15 Pages 658-679,
Att: 16 Pages 680-746,
Att: 17 Pages 747-765,
Att: 18 Pages 766-796,
Att: 19 Pages 797-820,
Att: 20 Pages 821-850,
Att: 21 Pages 851-875,
Att: 22 Pages 876-960,
Att: 23 Pages 961-976,
Att: 24 Pages 977-1011,
Att: 25 Pages 1012-1048,
Att: 26 Pages 1049-1065,
Att: 27 Pages 1066-1107
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
7 7 misc Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (GO 707) Thu 05/11 2:42 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Anh Tuyet Thai. (exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
6 6 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 05/04 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23CV639-RBM-BLM.(no document attached) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/03 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)Attorney Oscar Gonzalez de Llano added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/10 2:34 PM
ORDER Granting2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying of Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/10/2023. (exs)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Social Security Case Assignment Mon 04/10 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Barbara Lynn Major has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel are hereby notified of plaintiff's right to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Provided, as an attachment to this notice, is a consent/declination form for plaintiff to complete. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (dim)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 08, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/10 9:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anh Tuyet Thai. (dim)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/10 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, IFP Filed, filed by Anh Tuyet Thai. The new case number is 3:23-cv-639-BLM. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is assigned to the case. (Manbeck, Alexandra)(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet