Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:23-cv-00553
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:17 PM PDT
Defendant
Empowerme Wellness LLC
Represented By
John Bradley Bigos
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Caitlin Jones
Represented By
Amy K Maloney
Maloney O'Laughlin PLLC
contact info
Steven A Toff
Maloney O'Laughlin PLLC
contact info
Matthew James O'Laughlin
Maloney O'Laughlin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
31 31 order 1 - Order Wed 02/28 2:23 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice and without assessment by the Court of costs or attorneys' fees to either party. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation Wed 02/28 1:28 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal by parties (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/07 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement - Stipulated by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/23 10:53 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per the parties'29 Stipulated Notice of Settlement of All Claims Against All Parties (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/04 3:15 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, with JURY DEMAND by Empowerme Wellness LLC.(Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/01 3:23 PM
ORDER denying Defendant's19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/01 2:47 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC, TO RESPONSE to19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
25 25 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/27 12:27 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Caitlin Jones, to19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII . (Toff, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Mon 11/13 9:15 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re Defendant's19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII . Noted by clerk for 12/1/2023, per Defendant's24 Errata. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
24 24 misc Errata Fri 11/10 2:34 PM
ERRATA re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII ,23 Proposed Order (Unsigned),22 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC(Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, November 09, 2023
23 23 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Thu 11/09 6:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re21 Declaration,19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII ,20 Declaration,,22 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Request Thu 11/09 6:33 PM
REQUEST by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion to Dismiss re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII ,20 Declaration,, (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration Thu 11/09 6:20 PM
DECLARATION of James Smith filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration Thu 11/09 6:11 PM
DECLARATION of Brad Bigos filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII(Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from MO Apr 7, 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Email to Pl's Counsel April 19, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Record of Interview,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Log of EEOC Proceeding,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - EEOC Notice and Acknowledgment of Dual-Filed Charge,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Christensen v Spencer,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Moore v Effectual Inc,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Gobin v Microsoft Corporation,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Howard v Kijakazi,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Beeman v Mayorkas,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Smith v Legacy Partners Inc
19 19 motion Dismiss Thu 11/09 5:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Under Title VII , filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC. Noting Date 12/8/2023, (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 10/27 11:46 AM
ORDER granting Parties'17 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendant's deadline to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be extended to 11/14/2023. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
17 17 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 10/26 4:36 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC. Noting Date 10/26/2023, (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/10 10:46 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Empowerme Wellness LLC with JURY DEMAND filed by Caitlin Jones.(O'Laughlin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, July 24, 2023
15 15 order JHC Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Mon 07/24 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/12/2024, Discovery Motions due by 3/13/2024, Discovery completed by 4/12/2024, Dispositive motions due by 5/13/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/11/2024, Motions in Limine due by 7/29/2024, Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2024, Deposition Designations due by 8/21/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/3/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/3/2024. (AD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
14 14 order 1 - Order Tue 07/18 7:55 AM
ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Protective Order Tue 07/18 7:54 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Mon 07/17 3:54 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) : ESI Agreement (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Mon 07/17 3:53 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) : Stipulated Protective Order (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Joint Status Report Mon 07/17 3:47 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Thu 07/06 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney John Bradley Bigos. Filed by Defendant Empowerme Wellness LLC. (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 06/12 4:25 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/26/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/10/2023. (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
7 7 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 06/05 1:53 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent EmpowerMe Holdings, LLC for Empowerme Wellness LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Empowerme Wellness LLC. (Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/25 12:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND Attorney John Bradley Bigos added to party Empowerme Wellness LLC(pty:dft) by Empowerme Wellness LLC.(Bigos, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/17 11:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven A Toff on behalf of Plaintiff Caitlin Jones. (Toff, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/11 9:31 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant EmpowerMe Wellness, LLC (CR)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 04/11 9:28 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc: ad hoc atty Toff email. (CR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/11 9:21 AM
Judge John H. Chun added. (CR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/10 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew James O'Laughlin on behalf of Plaintiff Caitlin H Jones. (O'Laughlin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/10 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) EmpowerMe Wellness, LLC with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Amy K Maloney added to party Caitlin H Jones(pty:pla) filed by Caitlin H Jones.(Maloney, Amy)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7963537
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons