New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:23-cv-02005
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 1:46 PM EDT
Defendant
PRATEEK GATTANI
Defendant
IDC TECHNOLOGIES
Defendant
T.K. KURIEN
Defendant
ABIDALI NEEMUCHWALA
Defendant
AZIM HASHIM PREMJI
Defendant
THIERRY DELAPORTE
Defendant
WIPRO ENTERPRISE LTD
Defendant
WIPRO LIMITED
Plaintiff
PALANI KARUPAIYAN
PP, RP 1326 W WILLIAM STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19132

GPO Jul 31 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 7/31/2023. (kht) Modified on 8/1/2023 (kht).

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 2:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PRATEEK GATTANI, IDC TECHNOLOGIES, WIPRO LIMITED, filed by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ADS)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Change of address,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Application IFP,
Att: 7 Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/24 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by PALANI KARUPAIYAN Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Friday, February 14, 2025
28 28 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/14 11:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Plaintiff's "Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Renew Forma Pauperis." (Docket Entry No.26 .) The District Court, in accordance with the Third Circuit's mandate, has provided Plaintiff with an additional opportunity to file an Amended Complaint and a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). (Docket Entry Nos. 25 and27 .) Plaintiff requests an additional ninety (90) days to file an Amended Complaint and a renewed IFP application. After review of Plaintiff's motion, the Court hereby grants Plaintiff's request. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint and a renewed IFP application or pay the appropriate filing fee by April 16, 2025. To the extent that Plaintiff argues that his ability to litigate this action is impeded due to his medical conditions, he may file a request for the appointment of pro bono counsel once the District Court has screened his Amended Complaint or the appropriate filing fee has been paid. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Docket Entry No.26 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/14/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
27 27 appeal USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Wed 02/05 7:53 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to7 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by PALANI KARUPAIYAN (Finance notified)(ca3sb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinion
misc Docket Annotation (public) Wed 02/05 9:47 AM
Pursuant to Mandate of the USCA, the Order of the USDC entered on 8/1/2023 is hereby AFFIRMED in part and VACATED in part and that this matter is remanded for further proceedings. (mlh)
Related: [-]
appeal Mandate Notice Wed 02/05 9:48 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 2/5/2025.. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 01/23 11:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and renew Forma Pauperis by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ADS) (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
25 25 order Text Order Thu 01/16 11:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit's decision in Karupaiyan v. Wipro LTD , Civ. No. 23-2424 2025 WL 89076, at *1 (3d Cir. Jan. 14, 2025). Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which to file an Amended Complaint and a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") or pay the appropriate filing fee consistent with the Third Circuit's ruling. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 1/16/2025. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
24 24 appeal USCA Judgment (Use if Mandate will follow) Tue 01/14 12:43 PM
USCA JUDGMENT ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District Court entered August 1, 2023, be and the same hereby is Affirmed In Part and Vacated In Part and that this matter is Remanded for further proceedings. Costs will not be taxed. (ca3tmm, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
23 23 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/22 9:18 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, March 21, 2024
22 22 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 03/22 11:20 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Received by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/13 11:49 AM
SUBMISSION Received by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Monday, March 11, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/12 2:42 PM
SUBMISSION Received by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
19 19 misc Letter Tue 03/12 10:53 AM
Letter regarding Amended Complaint from Palani Karupaiyan. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jdg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Thursday, February 29, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/29 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Petition filed with the US Supreme Court by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Appendix,
Att: 3 Appendix,
Att: 4 Certificate,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus Tue 02/20 8:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon a review of its docket. On July 31, 2023, the Court issued a Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application without prejudice and granting him leave to filed an amended application and amended complaint. (ECF Nos.5 &6 .) Plaintiff responded by filing a Notice of Appeal and Motion for Writ of Mandamus directed to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals. (ECF Nos.7 &9 .) On February 14, 2024, the Court received notice that the Court of Appeals denied Plaintiff's petition for writ of mandamus. Third Cir. Case No. 23-3044 Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to administratively terminate the Motion for Writ of Mandamus pending on this docket at ECF No.9 . So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 2/20/2024. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
17 17 appeal USCA Order (Terms Appeal) Tue 02/20 9:34 AM
ORDER of USCA as to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by PALANI KARUPAIYAN (Finance notified) (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/21 10:35 AM
Petition for a Writ of Certiorari by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/13 12:28 PM
Documents filed with the Third Circut by PALANI KARUPAIYAN Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Att: 1 Motion,
Att: 2 Application IFP
Thursday, September 21, 2023
13 13 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 09/21 11:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Plaintiff's September 1, 2023 letter motion (ECF No.11 ), which asks that the Court allow him to withdraw his letter motion that asked for six months to amend his complaint (ECF No.10 ). The request is granted and both motions are hereby withdrawn. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos.10 &11 . So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 9/21/23. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/20 11:59 AM
NOTICE right to sue letter from EEOC by PALANI KARUPAIYAN Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Friday, September 01, 2023
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/01 2:43 PM
MOTION To Allow Plaintiff to Withdraw10 LETTER MOTION requesting additional six months to Amend Complaint by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/01 2:45 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION To Allow Plaintiff to Withdraw10 LETTER MOTION requesting additional six months to Amend Complaint. Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Fri 08/11 1:11 PM
LETTER MOTION requesting additional six months to Amend Complaint by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/11 1:14 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
9 9 motion Writ of Mandamus Fri 08/04 2:24 PM
MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP,
Att: 2 Order,
Att: 3 Opinion
8 8 misc Application to Proceed IFP Fri 08/04 2:19 PM
APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
Related: [-]
7 7 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Fri 08/04 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to6 Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis, by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (An IFP form has been submitted) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order,
Att: 2 Opinion
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/04 2:25 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/01 9:05 AM
Order Denying1 -2 IFP Application. The Clerk shall administratively terminate this case. Plaintiff may have the above-entitled case reopened, if, within thirty (30) days of the date of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff either pre-pays the $402 filing fee or submits to the Clerk a proper and complete IFP application. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 7/31/2023. (kht) Modified on 8/1/2023 (kht)
Related: [-]
5 5 10 pgs order Opinion Tue 08/01 8:59 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 7/31/2023. (kht) Modified on 8/1/2023 (kht)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 08/01 9:09 AM
A copy of the5 Memorandum Opinion,6 Order and a blank IFP Application mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 8/1/2023. (kht) Modified on 8/1/2023 (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/01 9:11 AM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated per6 Order. (kht) Modified on 8/1/2023 (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/13 11:02 AM
CONSENT & REGISTRATION Form to Receive Documents Electronically by PALANI KARUPAIYAN. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/13 10:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PALANI KARUPAIYAN Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Monday, April 10, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Mon 04/10 10:51 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (kht)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 09, 2023
1 1 service Complaint Received Mon 04/10 10:51 AM
Complaint Received.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application IFP,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Request for Notification by Email