James Martin v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, et al
Original Case: 9:20-md-02924
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-prici-11111 |
Type | private civil / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2023 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. USA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARLENE GOLDENBERG
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
APOTEX CORP.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL MCCANDLESS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRAD ALDRIDGE
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/21/2023 4:26 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
MULTI APPEAL DOCKETED. |