Cook et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01444 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-02572 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 10:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation, 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Rollings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Middleton
211254 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Porro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Philbin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Murphy, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Mueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Moten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Triplett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Rundell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Shepherd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Singleton
156097 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Werner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bandy Smiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Watson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Warner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Waggoner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joane Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Alston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Blakely, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trini Bocanegra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Bouray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Callender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Skipper Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrence Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Conti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Rocky Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Ealey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Farry, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luz Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Garrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Gillenwater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Gutierrez
170 Knighton Road
Spartanburg, SC 29306 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Hanes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Henselmeier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lennard Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cloid Fretwell, Peter Hegre, Duncan Kelly, Christopher Meadows, Deanna Springhetti, Milton Baxter, David Staud, Gary Stolz, Agapito Arredondo, Victor Atkinson, Richard Garcia, Jennifer Havard, Keith Johnson, Francisco Juarez, Tim Martin, Ricky Murphy, Rickey Oneal, Joseph Polk, Bernard Robinson, Agabita Rowe, Douglas Whitman, Robert Goodson, Isiah Martin, John McDavid Sr, Louis McHenry, Jackie Rodgers, Robert Thomas, Clyde Turney, Christine Marie Vaughn, Mark Greuling, Zebedee Johnson, Aaron Sarver, Steve Acheson, Howard Brill, Duane Brucker, Henry Burnett, Preston Cadwalder, Steve De Simone, Robert Gibson, Willie Green, John Greenaway, Terry Redden, Gerald Sandvik, Larry Rocky Martin, Kim Moten, Leon Phillips, Bandy Smiley, Timothy Waggoner, Edward Williams Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bruce Kelly without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Kelly, Bruce J; Riley, Michael; Rollings, Paul; Rundell, Edward; Wilson, Paul; Clark, Alan D.; Fernandez, Anthony; Gonzales, Manuel; Hayes, Anthony; Jackson, Claudette; Spikes, Angela; Lucas, Gary; Nogueira, John; Willette, Charles; Austin, Geraldine; Boren, Joel; Burchett, Frederick E.; Fenoglia, Timothy; Gonzales, Samuel; Hopkins Sr, Barry; Jefferson, Sheldon; Nelson, Phillip; Newsome Jr, William; Perez, Victoriano; Young, IssacAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01444-RMG, 2:23-cv-01445-RMG, 2:23-cv-01952-RMG, 2:23-cv-01953-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Pdschun without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Podschun, Benjamin; Serkin, Warren; Gonzales, Salvador P.; McCowen, JD; Charles, Roberta; Robertson, James; Craddock, Kerry; Gesse, Michael; Gibbs, Gary; Kerfoot, Jimmy; Ramirez, Roger H; Wilkerson, Danny; Gibson, Kenneth; Alonzo, Miguel; Howard, Amy; Martinez, Anthony; Turner, Jessica; Barnes, Timothy W.; Burton, Roger R; Callender, Anthony R; Conti, Carolyn; Dunn, Douglas; Fuller, Luz; Gillenwater, Mark; Hanes, KathyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/25 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Singleton Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01444-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 4/10/2023), 1:23-cv-02572, Cook et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01444-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/12 3:40 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02572. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/7/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27521999).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/12/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |