California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00111
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2023
Terminated:Apr 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 12:48 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kaylan Joseph Cureton (1)
Terminated: 04/13/2023


Docket last updated: 04/15/2023 2:37 AM PDT
Thursday, April 13, 2023
1 1 1 pgs TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION: Received from The District of Columbia as to Kaylan Joseph Cureton (1). (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]