BERK v. ROTHMAN INSTITUTE ORTHOPEDIC FOUNDATION et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John F Murphy |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01437 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:41 PM EDT |
Defendant
ALEXANDER R. VACCARO, MD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID I PEDOWITZ MD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN INSTITUTE ORTHOPEDIC FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN ORTHO PA HOLDCO I., P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN ORTHO PA HOLDCO III, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN ORTHO PA HOLDCO IV, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, L.P.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROTHMAN ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVEN M. RAIKIN, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAROLD R. BERK
Harold R. Berk 17000 SW AMBROSE WAY
PORT ST LUCIE, FL 34986 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Thu 07/18 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re51 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by HAROLD R. BERK. USCA Case Number 24-2293 (er) |
|
52 | 52
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 9:56 AM
NOTICE by HAROLD R. BERK re50 Order on Motion for Relief Under 60B, of Correction of the Caption to list Plaintiff's Name as Harold R. Berk instead of the erroneous Howard R. Berk (BERK, HAROLD) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
51 | 51
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Tue 07/16 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by HAROLD R. BERK. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-17603547. (BERK, HAROLD) |
|
50 | 50
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Relief Under 60B
Tue 07/16 11:32 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT; PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENT TO HIS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ARE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/16/24.7/16/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/15 1:31 PM
NOTICE by HAROLD R. BERK Letter to Honorable John Murphy re Pending Motions under Rules 60(b) and 59(e) for Relief from Judgment (BERK, HAROLD) |