Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-30142

Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bess M Parrish Creswell
Case #: 2:23-ap-03006
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Glenda Marche Washington, Defendant
8157 Grayson Grove
Montgomery, AL 36117
Represented By
Glenda Marche Washington
contact info
Plaintiff
Republic Finance, LLC, Plaintiff
P.O. Box 1028
Montgomery, AL 36101
Represented By
Richard C. Dean, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Sunday, November 05, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 11/05 10:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, November 03, 2023
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 11/03 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
27 27 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Order Fri 11/03 1:08 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered On 11/3/2023. (KC)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Motion Fri 11/03 7:53 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/03 1:25 PM
Adversary Case Closed 23-03006 (Non-Image Entry). (KC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
25 25 order Set Hearing Order Tue 10/31 6:29 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time and Setting Status Hearing Entered On 10/31/202 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/6/2023 at 10:00 AM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (JAW)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion To Set Hearing,24 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC
Monday, October 30, 2023
24 24 motion Extend Time Motion Mon 10/30 4:59 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Exhibits filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Thursday, October 19, 2023
23 23 misc Pretrial Documents - Pretrial Initial Disclosure, Pretrial Disclosure, Pretrial Statement Thu 10/19 4:11 PM
Submission of Pretrial Documents Pre-Trial Statement filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Thursday, October 05, 2023
22 22 misc Pretrial Documents - Pretrial Initial Disclosure, Pretrial Disclosure, Pretrial Statement Thu 10/05 3:55 PM
Submission of Pretrial Documents Plaintiff's Pre-Trial Disclosures filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Contract
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule A
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Appraisal Form
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - UCC
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Loan Check
Saturday, July 29, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 07/30 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Thursday, July 27, 2023
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/27 12:26 PM
Scheduling Order Entered On 7/27/2023. Discovery due by 8/31/2023.Dispositive Pretrial Motions due by 9/8/2023. Pretrial Disclosures due by 10/5/2023. Objections to Pretrial Disclosures due by 10/12/2023. Joint Pretrial Statement due by 10/19/2023. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Creswell Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. Trial date set for 11/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Creswell Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/03 11:17 AM
Debtor's Answer to Complaint filed by Glenda Marche Washington. (CB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
18 18 court Hrg Cont Tue 06/27 3:18 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 07/25/2023 at 01:50 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
Friday, June 02, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/02 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service for Six Documents filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 14 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC,16 Notice of Submission Error/Refiling
16 16 court Notice of Submission Error/Refiling Fri 06/02 12:42 PM
Notice of Submission Error requiring refiling. The signature block does not contain a complete address required by LBR 9011-1. Please correct the error and file an amended document.. Please refile a corrected document within 7 days or your pleading may be dismissed Related [+]. Corrected filing due by 6/9/2023. (AC)
Related: [-] 14 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 01, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 06/01 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/01 10:10 AM
Certificate of Service for Six Documents filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC,3 Summons Issued,8 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC,10 Clerk's Entry of Default,11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC,13 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
13 13 order Set Hearing Order Tue 05/30 3:08 PM
Order Setting Hearing On Motion For Default Judgment Entered On 5/30/202 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2023 at 01:15 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (KC)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC
Saturday, May 27, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 05/27 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, May 25, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Motion AP Thu 05/25 1:59 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/25 8:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. (Suckman, Brian)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Republic Finance, LLC
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
8 8 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 05/24 2:04 PM
Request for Entry of Default filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Tue 05/23 5:14 PM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 04/20 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/20/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/19 3:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on Glenda Marche Washington 4/19/2023 . Related [+]. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 04/18 4:08 PM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff to be served on Defendant Glenda Marche Washington Date Issued 4/18/2023, Answer Due 5/18/2023. Execution of Summons to be done by 4/25/2023. (JAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 04/17 5:00 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-03006 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A14487361, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/17 4:59 PM
Adversary case 23-03006 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint against Glenda Marche Washington. Fee Amount $350. filed by Richard C. Dean Jr. on behalf of Republic Finance, LLC. (Dean, Richard)
Related: [-]