New Jersey District Court
Judge:Peter G Sheridan
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:23-cv-02170
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 6:36 AM EDT
Defendant
BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC
Represented By
ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
LAUREN JILL MARCUS
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY MARSDEN
Represented By
ARI R. KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
W. CHARLES SIPIO
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti P.C.
contact info
SAMANTHA PANKEY MARTIN
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
COMMAND ROBBINSVILLE LLC
Terminated: 08/01/2023


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Monday, April 22, 2024
22 22 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/26 3:55 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/22/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/18 4:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice, Jointly Filed by BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 02/29 8:36 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/29/2024. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/29/2024. (ijf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 02/28 6:06 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 2/28/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
19 19 order Order Fri 01/19 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: At the parties' request, discovery in this action is stayed pending the outcome of the Settlement Conference on 2/28/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/19/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/11 1:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference is adjourned to 2/28/2024 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/11/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/19 6:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 2/8/2024 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/19/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 12/19 6:31 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/19/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/03 4:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 12/19/2023 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/3/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 10/18 5:08 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/18/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
15 15 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Tue 08/08 3:40 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TIMOTHY MARSDEN. (SIPIO, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/02 2:49 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Any motion to amend the pleadings due by 10/6/2023. Fact Discovery due by 2/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/2/2023. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/01 2:41 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER amending the caption and dismissing defendant Command Robbinsville LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/1/2023. (mg)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 08/09 4:36 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/1/2023, via telephone. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
12 12 order Order Mon 07/31 4:54 PM
TEXT ORDER the Initial Conference set for 8/1/2023 at 11:00 will be conducted via AT&T. Dial in number is 888-684-8852, access code 3213610#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/31/2023. (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 07/25 12:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Command Robbinsville LLC Without Prejudice & To Amend Caption of the Complaint by BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC, COMMAND ROBBINSVILLE LLC. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 06/21 10:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 8/1/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/21/2023. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/16 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC.(MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 06/16 2:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC identifying Bind Rite as Corporate Parent.. (MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/16 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN JILL MARCUS on behalf of BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC (MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/16 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU on behalf of BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/28 3:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY MARSDEN. BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/19 11:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC and COMMAND ROBBINSVILLE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA PANKEY MARTIN on behalf of TIMOTHY MARSDEN (MARTIN, SAMANTHA)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES SIPIO on behalf of TIMOTHY MARSDEN (SIPIO, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/18 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against BIND RITE ROBBINSVILLE, LLC, COMMAND ROBBINSVILLE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14255620) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIMOTHY MARSDEN.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/19 11:20 AM
Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mlh)
Related: [-]