Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Staci M Yandle
Case #: 3:23-cv-01276
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2023
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2023 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Breese Journal And Publishing Company
Represented By
Amanda E Colvin
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner - St. Louis
contact info
Kathryn P. Scott
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Smith
Represented By
Alexander J. Taylor
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Nathan C. Volheim
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
24 24 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 12/03 2:20 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/3/2024. (mah)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Tue 12/03 2:19 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties filed a Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc.21 ), in which they stipulated that this case should be dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), a Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all the parties who have appeared in the action is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See e.g. Jenkins v. Village of Maywood , 506 F.3d 622, 624 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/3/2024. (mah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
22 22 notice Notice Regarding Filing Thu 01/25 10:16 AM
NOTICE REGARDING FILING re21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Breese Journal And Publishing Company. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (kdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/24 4:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Breese Journal And Publishing Company. (Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/16 10:36 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Selecting Mediator (Doc.19 ) is GRANTED. Stipulation selecting mediator due by February 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/16/2024. (mah)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 01/16 12:18 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 2/12/2024. (aza)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/12 1:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Selecting Mediator by Breese Journal And Publishing Company. (Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 12/14 1:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by July 24, 2024; dispositive motions due by August 8, 2024; final pretrial conference set for December 5, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; and jury trial set for December 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. in the Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. The scheduling conference set for December 15, 2023 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2023.(mah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Report of Parties
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/01 1:19 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for December 15, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: All parties should call toll free 877-873-8017 and enter the access code 4354777. The parties shall submit a Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order at least seven (7) days prior to the conference call by email to SMYpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov . Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/1/2023. (slh)
Related: [-]
16 16 order CJRA Track Wed 11/01 1:16 PM
CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle.(slh)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 11/01 12:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/1/2023. (slh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 07/24 2:52 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Breese Journal And Publishing Company. (Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/24 2:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Breese Journal And Publishing Company.(Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/23 9:47 AM
ORDER: Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Doc.11 ) is GRANTED. Responsive pleading due by July 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/23/2023. (mah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/22 3:22 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Breese Journal And Publishing Company. (Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/22 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn P. Scott on behalf of Breese Journal And Publishing Company (Scott, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/22 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda E. Colvin on behalf of Breese Journal And Publishing Company (Colvin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
8 8 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Fri 05/12 11:17 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-01276-SMY. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/11 11:14 AM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/25 8:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Smith. Breese Journal And Publishing Company waiver sent on 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/20 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Breese Journal And Publishing Company. Original mailed to Attorney Taylor. (jlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Thu 04/20 8:44 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Orders 257 and 341. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent:. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-1276-RJD. Consent due by 5/11/2023 (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Charles Smith (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Taylor on behalf of Charles Smith (Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/19 12:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Breese Journal And Publishing Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5055411.), filed by Charles Smith.(Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet