Cox et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01583 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-02724 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2023 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Plaintiff
Carey Gill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Belton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Hutcheson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quencell Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryon Holland
(96-A-4074) Downstate Correctional Facility P.O. Box 445
Fishkill, NY 12524 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Guerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Gallegos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Fusco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officer John Charles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ali Droubi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Damaskinos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henrietta Dallas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micheal Coohon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 4/17/2023), 1:23-cv-02724, Cox et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01583-RMG (sshe, ) | |
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 04/20 7:59 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02724. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/13/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties hereto and their undersigned counsel that if this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability multi-district litigation ("AFFF MDL"), then the deadline for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Notice of Removal, addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Nicole G. McDonough, Esq. dated April 6, 2023. filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/11/2023) (tg) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Notice of Removal, addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Nicole G. McDonough, Esq. dated April 6, 2023. Document filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | ||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151975/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27548024).Document filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/20/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (State Court Complaint) |