Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia M Kendall
Referred: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Case #: 1:23-cv-02520
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 4:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Chase Real Estate, LLC
Represented By
Matthew R. Henderson
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Johnathon Christian Koechley
Hinshaw & Culbertson
contact info
Defendant
Marcin Chojnacki
Represented By
Eric Joseph Shukis
Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC
contact info
Robert T. Boylan
Foran Glennon Palandech & Ponzi PC
contact info
Defendant
EJ Investment Group, Inc.
Defendant
FNBO Property Management, LLC
Represented By
William B. Oberts
Tribler Orpett And Meyer, P.C.
contact info
Michael R. Spanel
Tribler Orpett & Meyer, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
First National Financial Inc.
Represented By
Artapong Sriratana
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Michael Sadic
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rachel Irwin
Represented By
Jefferey Ogden Katz
The Katz Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
1st Midwest Financial, Inc.
Represented By
Artapong Sriratana
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Michael Sadic
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Long
Represented By
Artapong Sriratana
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Michael Sadic
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Defendant
Laurena Mikosz
Represented By
William B. Oberts
Tribler Orpett And Meyer, P.C.
contact info
Michael R. Spanel
Tribler Orpett & Meyer, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kendall Murphy
Represented By
Artapong Sriratana
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Michael Sadic
Sadic & Sriratana LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Lau
Represented By
Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero, Attorneys At Law, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero
contact info
Plaintiff
Harry Tang
Represented By
Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero, Attorneys At Law, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero
contact info
Plaintiff
Tony Lau
Represented By
Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero, Attorneys At Law, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero
contact info
Plaintiff
Rick Chen
Represented By
Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero, Attorneys At Law, P.C.
contact info
Lisa Marie Gaspero
Gaspero & Gaspero
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2023
Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, ) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/6/2023. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 34, 47 are denied in their entirety. Plaintiffs' claims in Counts I-VI may move forward consistent with Opinion. See

Docket last updated: 11/11/2024 9:51 PM CST
Friday, April 21, 2023
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rick Chen, Thomas Lau, Tony Lau, Harry Tang by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaspero, Lisa)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rick Chen, Thomas Lau, Tony Lau, Harry Tang by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT filed by Tony Lau, Thomas Lau, Rick Chen, Harry Tang; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20565345.(Gaspero, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit