Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-01927
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:23-cv-00913
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 3:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Dawson
Represented By
Charles H. Johnson
Law Offices Of Charles H. Johnson, P.A.
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2023
ORDER Dismissing Cases with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Pretrial Order No. 240. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/6/2023. Associated Cases: see Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Monday, November 06, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order Mon 11/06 3:54 PM
ORDER Dismissing Cases with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Pretrial Order No. 240. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/6/2023. Associated Cases: see Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Closed Wed 11/08 3:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 11/6/2023 in the MDL 3:16-md-02741-VC master file (dkt. #17469), civil case no. 3:23-cv-01927-VC is terminated. cc: JPMDL. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 06/06 9:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Jesse Dawson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 06/06 9:18 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Jesse Dawson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/06 9:17 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Jesse Dawson] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 04/24 7:22 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:23-cv-00913. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-393) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 04/24 7:39 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re: 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of Minnesota, 0:23-cv-00913-NEB-DTS, Dawson v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-01927-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 393 cc: JPMDL. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
4 4 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2741 re:1 Complaint. (CLK)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (CLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-913 NEB/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10194543) filed by Jesse Dawson. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet