Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Michael J Frank
Case #: 4:23-cv-00163
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2023 1:42 PM EDT
Defendant
Brian Aungst, Jr.
Defendant
John Classe
Defendant
RONALD D DESANTIS
Defendant
Martin Garcia
Defendant
Meredith Ivey
Defendant
Ron Peri
Defendant
Michael Sasso
Defendant
Bridget Ziegler
Plaintiff
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Represented By
ADAM COLBY LOSEY
Losey Pllc - Orlando Fl
contact info


1. Disney revamps federal lawsuit against Gov. DeSantis (cbsnews.com)
Submitted Tue 05/09/2023
Docket last updated: 06/02/2023 6:33 PM EDT
Friday, June 02, 2023
48 48 ORDER REGARDING 34 SCHEDULE. (Deadline to file motions to dismiss is 6/26/2023 ., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2023 ., Plaintiff's deadline to respond to any motions to dismiss is 7/26/2023 ., Defendants may reply no later than 8/9/2023 ). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/2/2023. (kdm)
Related: [-]
47 47 ORDER STRIKING 44 FILING OF NONPARTY. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/2/2023. The court has denied Huminski's motion to intervene. ECF No. 24 ; see also ECF No. 28 (denying reconsideration). (kdm)
Related: [-]
46 46 NOTICE of Appearance by ANITA J PATEL on behalf of RONALD D DESANTIS, MEREDITH IVEY (PATEL, ANITA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
45 45 14 pgs ORDER ON DISQUALIFICATION. Defendants' motion to disqualify, ECF No. 33 , is DENIED. However, for other reasons articulated here, I disqualify myself from further participation in this case. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/1/2023. (erl) **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:23cv163 AW/MJF.
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re:45 Order on Disqualification. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
44 44 7 pgs motion Extend Time Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/30 7:33 AM
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME and MOTION TO REFER OBSTRUCTION OF SERVICE TO FEDERAL LAW ENFORCEMENT by Scott Huminski. (sjb)
Related: [-]
43 43 19 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 05/25 3:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re33 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Mark E. Walker filed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 2:29 PM
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C), the above attorney is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of the relevant defendants. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/25/2023. (jcw) (Appointed PETER ANDREW PATTERSON)
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 2:22 PM
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C), the above attorney is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of the relevant defendants. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/25/2023. (jcw) (Appointed JOHN D RAMER)
Related: [-]
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 2:18 PM
ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C), the above attorney is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of the relevant defendants. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/25/2023. (jcw) (Appointed MEGAN MARIE WOLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
39 39 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/24 10:33 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Ramer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7884845.) by BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER. (RAMER, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
38 38 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/24 10:22 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan M. Wold.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7884809.) by BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER. (WOLD, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/24 10:13 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter A. Patterson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7884789.) by BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER. (PATTERSON, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/23 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HENRY THOMPSON on behalf of BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER (THOMPSON, DAVID)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/23 8:54 AM
NOTICE - This Court will take no action, scheduling or otherwise, in this case until it rules on the pending motion for disqualification. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/23/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
34 34 5 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 05/22 12:49 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule and Service of Process by RONALD D DESANTIS, MEREDITH IVEY. (WHITAKER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
33 33 18 pgs motion Disqualify Judge Fri 05/19 3:02 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge Mark E. Walker by RONALD D DESANTIS. (GUARD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/19 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRENT GONZALEZ on behalf of BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER (GONZALEZ, JASON)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/19 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH MASTERMAN on behalf of BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER (MASTERMAN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/19 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES JUSTIN COOPER on behalf of BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, MARTIN GARCIA, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER (COOPER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/19 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID MATTHEW COSTELLO on behalf of RONALD D DESANTIS (COSTELLO, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 05/16 1:36 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Accordingly, his motion for reconsideration, ECF No. 27 , is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/16/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
27 27 4 pgs motion Reconsideration Tue 05/16 9:44 AM
MOTION TO RECONSIDER OR TO AMEND FINAL ORDER by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
26 26 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Mon 05/08 10:05 AM
Plaintiff's First AMENDED Notice Under FRCP 5.1 and LR 24.1 filed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified on 5/9/2023 to correct document title. (kjw)
Related: [-]
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/08 10:00 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants , filed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified on 5/8/2023 edit to docket text (sjb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, May 04, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 05/04 1:38 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE - However, the motion to intervene, ECF No. 23 , is DENIED without prejudice to file a separate lawsuit. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/4/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
23 23 25 pgs motion Intervene Thu 05/04 10:34 AM
MOTION to Intervene (filed by a third party). (sjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/02 3:30 PM
ORDER ADMITTING DANIEL M. PETROCELLI PRO HAC VICE - The 21 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/2/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/02 1:42 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Petrocelli.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7848896.) by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (PETROCELLI, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, May 01, 2023
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. JOHN CLASSE served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. BRIDGET ZIEGLER served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. BRIAN AUNGST JR served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. MICHAEL SASSO served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. RON PERI served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. MARTIN GARCIA served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 6:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. MEREDITH IVEY served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/01 5:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. RONALD D DESANTIS served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 1:03 PM
ORDER ADMITTING ALAN E. SCHOENFELD PRO HAC VICE - The 6 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/28/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 1:02 PM
ORDER ADMITTING JONATHAN HACKER PRO HAC VICE - The 8 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/28/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 1:01 PM
ORDER ADMITTING STEPHEN D. BRODY PRO HAC VICE - The 7 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/28/23. (sjb)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 04/28 12:58 PM
ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Magistrate Judge within this District given my recusal. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/28/23. (sjb) (Please use new judge's initials for future filings: 4:23cv163 MW/MJF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 11:43 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Hacker.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7844215.) by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (HACKER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 11:32 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen D. Brody.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7844166.) by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (BRODY, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 10:33 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan E. Schoenfeld.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7843989.) by WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC. (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 04/28 12:59 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:9 Order (sjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 04/27 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to BRIAN AUNGST JR, JOHN CLASSE, RONALD D DESANTIS, MARTIN GARCIA, MEREDITH IVEY, RON PERI, MICHAEL SASSO, BRIDGET ZIEGLER. (sjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons,
Att: 2 summons,
Att: 3 summons,
Att: 4 summons,
Att: 5 summons,
Att: 6 summons,
Att: 7 summons
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
4 4 4 pgs notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 04/26 10:36 AM
NOTICE Under FRCP 5.1 and LR 24.1 by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 04/26 10:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY for Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc... (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/26 10:27 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 77 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/26 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7840257.), filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (LOSEY, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Summons for Ronald D. DeSantis,
Att: 4 Summons for Meredith Ivey,
Att: 5 Summons for Martin Garcia,
Att: 6 Summons for Michael Sasso,
Att: 7 Summons for Ron Peri,
Att: 8 Summons for Bridget Ziegler,
Att: 9 Summons for Brian Aungst, Jr.,
Att: 10 Summons for John Classe