Kennedy v. Booth et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:23-ap-05039 |
Nature of Suit | 81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Blazer Coal Development, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Southeastern Land, LLC
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equinox Land Company, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Czar Coal Corporation
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cougar Coal Company, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Collins Creek Services, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Coal Transport, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Coalburg Enterprises, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Capricorn Coal Shop, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Capricorn Coal Company, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blazer Coal Corporation
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Argus Energy, LLC
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pevler Coal Sales Company, Inc.
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eagle Coal Company, LLC
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Beech Fork Processing, LLC
81 Enterprise Drive
Debord, KY 41214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ted McGinnis
556 McGinnis Drive
Inez, KY 41224 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
James H. Booth
286 Old MIddlefork
Inez, KY 41224 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/12 10:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding 23-5039 Closed. (rah) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Order GRANTING Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (awd) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy (Johnson, Kristeena) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Order Striking Trial (awd) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mickey T. Webster Filed by on behalf of Argus Energy LLC, Beech Fork Processing, LLC, Blazer Coal Corporation, Blazer Coal Development, Inc., Capricorn Coal Company, Inc., Capricorn Coal Shop, Inc., Coal Transport, Inc., Coalburg Enterprises, Inc., Collins Creek Services, Inc., Cougar Coal Company, Inc., Czar Coal Corporation, Eagle Coal Company, LLC, Equinox Land Company, Inc., Pevler Coal Sales Company, Inc., Southeastern Land, LLC. (Webster, Mickey) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mary L Fullington Filed by on behalf of Argus Energy LLC, Beech Fork Processing, LLC, Blazer Coal Corporation, Blazer Coal Development, Inc., Capricorn Coal Company, Inc., Capricorn Coal Shop, Inc., Coal Transport, Inc., Coalburg Enterprises, Inc., Collins Creek Services, Inc., Cougar Coal Company, Inc., Czar Coal Corporation, Eagle Coal Company, LLC, Equinox Land Company, Inc., Pevler Coal Sales Company, Inc., Southeastern Land, LLC. (Fullington, Mary) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Order GRANTING Motion To Stay Order (scd) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion To Stay Order, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy (Johnson, Kristeena) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/02 4:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $6,300.00 by AF. Receipt Number 400005. (admin) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order to Pay Filing Fee Filing Fee due: 5/3/2023. (alf) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Spencer Keith Gray Filed by on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order for Trial. Trial set for 9/26/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (lmu) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (lmu) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 23-05039 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against James H. Booth, Ted McGinnis, Beech Fork Processing, LLC, Eagle Coal Company, LLC, Pevler Coal Sales Company, Inc., Argus Energy, LLC, Blazer Coal Corporation, Blazer Coal Development, Inc., Capricorn Coal Company, Inc., Capricorn Coal Shop, Inc., Coalburg Enterprises, Inc., Coal Transport, Inc., Collins Creek Services, Inc., Cougar Coal Company, Inc., Czar Coal Corporation, Equinox Land Company, Inc., Southeastern Land, LLC Fee Amount 350. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)) (Johnson, Kristeena) |