West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 5:23-bk-00212
Case Filed:May 01, 2023
Dismissed:May 17, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roxby Development LLC
c/o Jeffrey J. Morris1200 Market Street
Wheeling, WV 26003
Represented By
Salene Rae Mazur Kraemer
Mazurkraemer Business Law
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 United States Courthouse 300 Virginia Street East
Charleston, WV 25301

Docket last updated: 06/02/2023 12:03 PM EDT
Thursday, June 01, 2023
52 52 court Generic Notice (COURT USER) Thu 06/01 10:12 AM
Notice Related [+]. Objections due by 6/26/2023. (stb)
Related: [-] 51 Final Application for Compensation filed by Debtor Roxby Development LLC
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
51 51 motion Compensation Wed 05/31 6:54 PM
FINAL FEE APPLICATION OF MAZURKRAEMER BUSINESS LAW FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED AS COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS FOR THE PERIOD APRIL 17, 2023, THROUGH AND INCLUDING MAY 18, 2023 for Salene Mazur Kraemer, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/1/2023 to 5/18/2023, Fees: $21,647, Expenses: $3576. Filed by Salene Mazur Kraemer. (Kraemer, Salene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Services by Category
Att: 4 Exhibit B- Services by Chronology